Cabra Rural Developments Limited (issued a business number of 9429030998810) was launched on 04 Aug 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Top Floor, 3 Alice Avenue, Orewa, 0931 (type: registered, physical). 3 Alice Avenue, Orewa had been their registered address, up to 27 Feb 2013. 3000 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 120 shares (4 per cent of shares), namely:
Will Stone Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Fruitlands Road, Auckland postcode 0810. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 26 per cent of all shares (780 shares); it includes
Lw & Jl Barker Family Trust Limited (an entity) - located at Orewa, Orewa. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (1500 shares, 50%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Roscrea No 2 Trustee Limited, located at Orewa, Orewa (an entity). "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Cabra Rural Developments Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 24 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3 Alice Avenue, Orewa, 0931 | Service & physical | 04 Aug 2011 |
Top Floor, 3 Alice Avenue, Orewa, 0931 | Registered | 27 Feb 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ian Gordon Boocock
Manly, Whangaparaoa, 0930
Address used since 04 Aug 2011 |
Director | 04 Aug 2011 - current |
Duncan Murray Unsworth
Riverhead, Riverhead, 0820
Address used since 01 Apr 2021
Riverhead, Riverhead, 0820
Address used since 01 Feb 2017 |
Director | 04 Aug 2011 - current |
Lloyd William Barker
Orewa, Orewa, 0931
Address used since 01 Jan 2015 |
Director | 04 Aug 2011 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 Alice Avenue, Orewa, 0931 | Registered | 04 Aug 2011 - 27 Feb 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Will Stone Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042391760 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Fruitlands Road Auckland 0810 |
07 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lw & Jl Barker Family Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047173439 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
10 Dec 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Roscrea No 2 Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047295032 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
28 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hibiscus Independent Trustees 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031629355 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
04 Aug 2011 - current |
Unsworth, Duncan Murray Director |
Riverhead Riverhead 0820 |
04 Aug 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barker, Lloyd Individual |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
04 Aug 2011 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Barker, Jennifer Lynne Individual |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
04 Aug 2011 - 10 Dec 2018 |
Boocock, Pauline Terry Lou Individual |
Manly Whangaparaoa 0930 |
04 Aug 2011 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Boocock, Ian Gordon Director |
Manly Whangaparaoa 0930 |
04 Aug 2011 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Boocock, Ian Gordon Director |
Manly Whangaparaoa 0930 |
04 Aug 2011 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Barker, Lloyd Individual |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
04 Aug 2011 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Gideon Holdings Limited Top Floor, 3 Alice Avenue |
|
Architecture 37 Limited Top Floor, 3 Alice Avenue |
|
Carmal Homes Limited Top Floor, 3 Alice Avenue |
|
The Eaves Trustee Company Limited Top Floor, 3 Alice Avenue |
|
Ken & Arlene Eaves Trustee Company Limited Top Floor, 3 Alice Avenue |
|
Fishing Direct NZ Limited 28 Silverdale Street |
Foo Future Limited Suite 2, 44 Silverdale Street |
Go Eco Farming Limited Suite 2, 44 Silverdale Street |
Jka Limited Suite 2, 44 Silverdale Street |
Thomas Properties NZ Limited 25 Old Mill Road |
Hay Homes Limited 47 Manuel Road |
Hellesoe Properties Limited 8 Totara Views Drive |