Brunton Cropp & Co Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030921634) was launched on 06 Oct 2011. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 21 Andrews Avenue, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 (type: office, physical). 21 Andrews Avenue, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt had been their physical address, until 25 Aug 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Qian, Ying (an individual) located at Hutt Central, Lower Hutt postcode 5010. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 99 per cent of all shares (exactly 99 shares); it includes
Zhong, Liang (a director) - located at Hutt Central, Lower Hutt. "Accounting service" (business classification M693220) is the category the ABS issued Brunton Cropp & Co Limited. Our database was updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
21 Andrews Avenue, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Office | unknown |
69 Rutherford Street, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Physical & registered & service | 25 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Liang Zhong
Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 01 Nov 2013 |
Director | 30 Nov 2011 - current |
Thomas Arthur Brunn
Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5011
Address used since 06 Oct 2011 |
Director | 06 Oct 2011 - 01 Apr 2014 |
21 Andrews Avenue , Hutt Central , Lower Hutt , 5010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
21 Andrews Avenue, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Physical & registered | 06 Oct 2011 - 25 Aug 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Qian, Ying Individual |
Hutt Central Lower Hutt 5010 |
25 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhong, Liang Director |
Hutt Central Lower Hutt 5010 |
01 Dec 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brunn, Thomas Arthur Individual |
Hutt Central Lower Hutt 5011 |
06 Oct 2011 - 01 Apr 2014 |
Thomas Arthur Brunn Director |
Hutt Central Lower Hutt 5011 |
06 Oct 2011 - 01 Apr 2014 |
Amelia Connell Consultant Limited 21 Andrews Avenue |
|
Heartland Rural Supplies Limited 2nd Floor |
|
Halt Services Limited Level Four |
|
Automarine Tech Limited 21-23 Andrews Avenue |
|
Nigel Connell Engineers Limited 21-23 Andrews Ave |
|
David Yum Limited 2nd Floor |
Sandbagger Group Limited 1 Knights Road |
Terence Bartlett Accountants Limited Level 1, 8 Raroa Road |
Active (2015) Limited Level 1, 8 Raroa Road |
Financial Pioneers Limited 12 Martin Grove |
Tax Payer Refunds Limited 4 Matai Street |
Accsys Wgtn Limited 84a Pretoria Street |