Boanerges Trustee Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030877276) was started on 21 Nov 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 51 Pukenamu Road, Rd 1, Otaki, 5581 (type: registered, physical). Flat 12, 28 Williamson Avenue, Grey Lynn, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 13 Dec 2011. 1000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Halcrow, Corban James (an individual) located at Rd 1, Otaki postcode 5581,
Halcrow, Gerard Elmsley (a director) located at Auckland postcode 0627,
Corban Halcrow (a director) located at Rd 1, Otaki postcode 5581. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the ABS issued to Boanerges Trustee Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 14 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
51 Pukenamu Road, Rd 1, Otaki, 5581 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Dec 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gerard Elmsley Halcrow
Auckland, 0627
Address used since 01 Jul 2020
Raumati South, Kapiti, 5032
Address used since 29 May 2013 |
Director | 21 Nov 2011 - current |
Corban James Halcrow
Rd 1, Otaki, 5581
Address used since 01 Dec 2011 |
Director | 01 Dec 2011 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 12, 28 Williamson Avenue, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Physical & registered | 21 Nov 2011 - 13 Dec 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Halcrow, Corban James Individual |
Rd 1, Otaki 5581 |
08 Apr 2012 - current |
Halcrow, Gerard Elmsley Director |
Auckland 0627 |
21 Nov 2011 - current |
Corban James Halcrow Director |
Rd 1, Otaki 5581 |
08 Apr 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mitchell, Julie Elizabeth Individual |
Raumati South Kapiti 5032 |
08 Apr 2012 - 29 Nov 2013 |
Trade Secret Limited 51 Pukenamu Road |
|
Coastal Landscape Supplies Limited 55 Pukenamu Road |
|
M.s.c. Allan Group Limited 67 Pukenamu Road |
|
Salon Finance Limited 77 Pukenamu Road |
|
Salon Support Limited 77 Pukenamu Rd |
|
Mjm Building Limited 6 Sylvia Way |
Elmswood Corporate Trustee Limited 35 Addington Road |
Charlett Investment Trustee Limited 35 Addington Road |
Quilty Trustee Limited 3 Dittmer Street |
Adac Trustee Limited 55 Martin Road |
Sidi Rezegh Trustee Company Limited 75 Aorangi Road |
Kco Group Limited Level 1, 17-19 Seaview Road |