Leak Stopper Building Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030866430) was started on 29 Nov 2011. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 6 Ramsgate Terrace, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 (type: registered, physical). 27 Matipo Road, Mairangi Bay, Auckland had been their physical address, until 03 May 2019. Leak Stopper Building Limited used other aliases, namely: Leaking Stopper Building Limited from 28 Nov 2011 to 07 Aug 2014. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 45 shares (45 per cent of shares), namely:
Li, Fangjin Flora (an individual) located at Mairangi Bay, Auckland postcode 0630. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 55 per cent of all shares (55 shares); it includes
Yang, Zhenchang (a director) - located at Mairangi Bay, Auckland. "Building, house construction" (ANZSIC E301120) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Leak Stopper Building Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6 Ramsgate Terrace, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Postal & office & delivery | 25 Apr 2019 |
6 Ramsgate Terrace, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical & service | 03 May 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhenchang Yang
Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 07 Jun 2024
Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 29 Nov 2011 - current |
6 Ramsgate Terrace , Mairangi Bay , Auckland , 0630 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
27 Matipo Road, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical & registered | 12 Aug 2014 - 03 May 2019 |
6 Ramsgate Terrace, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical & registered | 29 Nov 2011 - 12 Aug 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Li, Fangjin Flora Individual |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 |
06 Aug 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yang, Zhenchang Director |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 |
29 Nov 2011 - current |
Brontobyte Limited 29 Matipo Road |
|
Split Limited 23 Matipo Road |
|
Saphra Limited 17 Matipo Road |
|
Forever Love Limited 34b Matipo Road |
|
Crossbow Limited 24a Mayfair Crescent |
|
Shazdell Limited 20 Matipo Road |
M G Hunter Construction Limited 11 Theodora Place |
Harbour Builders Limited 40 Penzance Road |
Accent On Building Group Limited 6b Channel View Road |
Lichtwark Building Limited 87b Penzance Road |
Mc Gregors Way (2008) Limited 8a Montrose Terrace |
Tech Passive Fire Limited 335 East Coast Road |