Devon Medical Centre Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030819429) was registered on 31 Jan 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 (type: registered, physical). 109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth had been their physical address, up to 31 Jul 2019. 1000 shares are allotted to 9 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 250 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
Bayeux Medical Limited (an entity) located at Strandon, New Plymouth postcode 4312. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 25 per cent of all shares (250 shares); it includes
Dalman, Neelam Anna (an individual) - located at Rd 4, New Plymouth,
Mcgrane, Yasmin Vicki (an individual) - located at Rd 4, New Plymouth,
Dalman, Matthew James Herman (an individual) - located at Rd 4, New Plymouth. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (250 shares, 25%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Leary, Patrick Eugene, located at Upper Vogeltown, New Plymouth (a director),
Leary, Joanne Lee, located at Upper Vogeltown, New Plymouth (an individual). Our data was last updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Registered & physical & service | 31 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicola Ann Jacquemard
Rd 1, New Plymouth, 4371
Address used since 31 Jan 2012 |
Director | 31 Jan 2012 - current |
Nicole Ann Jacquemard
Rd 1, New Plymouth, 4371
Address used since 31 Jan 2012 |
Director | 31 Jan 2012 - current |
Patrick Eugene Leary
Upper Vogeltown, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 31 Jan 2012 |
Director | 31 Jan 2012 - current |
Matthew James Herman Dalman
Rd 4, New Plymouth, 4374
Address used since 31 Jul 2023
Frankleigh Park, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 10 Mar 2014 |
Director | 01 Apr 2015 - current |
Jo-anne Dorothy Hucker
New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 01 Dec 2021 |
Director | 01 Dec 2021 - current |
Michael John Hardie Boys
New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 01 Jul 2020
Rd 4, New Plymouth, 4374
Address used since 31 Jan 2012 |
Director | 31 Jan 2012 - 01 Dec 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Physical & registered | 31 Jan 2012 - 31 Jul 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bayeux Medical Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050036776 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Strandon New Plymouth 4312 |
21 Dec 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dalman, Neelam Anna Individual |
Rd 4 New Plymouth 4374 |
29 Aug 2014 - current |
Mcgrane, Yasmin Vicki Individual |
Rd 4 New Plymouth 4374 |
29 Aug 2014 - current |
Dalman, Matthew James Herman Individual |
Rd 4 New Plymouth 4374 |
29 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leary, Patrick Eugene Director |
Upper Vogeltown New Plymouth 4310 |
31 Jan 2012 - current |
Leary, Joanne Lee Individual |
Upper Vogeltown New Plymouth 4310 |
31 Jan 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jaquemard, Raimond Emile Individual |
Rd 1 New Plymouth 4371 |
31 Jan 2012 - current |
Jaquemard, Nicola Ann Individual |
Rd 1 New Plymouth 4371 |
31 Jan 2012 - current |
Eden, James Gregory Individual |
Rd 1 New Plymouth 4371 |
31 Jan 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hardie Boys, Michael John Individual |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 |
31 Jan 2012 - 21 Dec 2021 |
Hardie Boys, Janet Individual |
Rd 4 New Plymouth 4374 |
31 Jan 2012 - 06 Sep 2018 |
Leary, Patrick Eugene Individual |
Upper Vogeltown New Plymouth 4310 |
31 Jan 2012 - 21 Dec 2021 |
Hardie Boys, Michael John Individual |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 |
31 Jan 2012 - 21 Dec 2021 |
T & L Uhlenberg Trustee Limited 109 Powderham Street |
|
Gordon Monmouth Trustee Company Limited 109-113 Powderham Street |
|
Rbs Invest Limited 109 Powderham Street |
|
Kotuku (2012) Limited 2nd Floor, Staples Rodway Bldg |
|
I & N Butler Nominees Limited 109-113 Powderham Street |
|
Soil And Plant Health Limited 109 Powderham Street |