Hawkins & Co Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030773202) was started on 07 Mar 2012. 10 addresess are in use by the company: 24 Gibraltar Crescent, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: registered, service). 44D Mountain Road, Epsom, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 14 Jul 2021. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Hawkins, Doug Gary Tumahu (a director) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. "Graphic design service - for advertising" (business classification M692450) is the classification the ABS issued Hawkins & Co Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
44 Mountain Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 29 Jul 2013 |
3 Farnham Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 06 Jul 2021 |
3 Farnham Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered & service | 14 Jul 2021 |
3 Farnham Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Postal | 02 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Doug Gary Tumahu Hawkins
Rd 3, Warkworth, 0873
Address used since 04 Oct 2023
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 01 Nov 2020
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 07 Mar 2012 - current |
Lisa Maree Bates
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 29 Jul 2013 |
Director | 07 Mar 2012 - 01 Jul 2018 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
3 Farnham Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Postal | 02 Jul 2022 |
24 Gibraltar Crescent, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Postal & shareregister | 08 Jul 2024 |
24 Gibraltar Crescent, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & service | 16 Jul 2024 |
3 Farnham Street , Parnell , Auckland , 1052 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
44d Mountain Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical | 01 Aug 2019 - 14 Jul 2021 |
44d Mountain Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered | 10 Jul 2018 - 14 Jul 2021 |
45 Anzac Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 10 Jul 2018 - 01 Aug 2019 |
44 Mountain Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered | 09 Jul 2018 - 10 Jul 2018 |
44 Mountain Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical | 06 Aug 2013 - 10 Jul 2018 |
45 Anzac Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 06 Aug 2013 - 09 Jul 2018 |
44d Mountain Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 07 Mar 2012 - 06 Aug 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hawkins, Doug Gary Tumahu Director |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
07 Mar 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bates, Lisa Maree Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
07 Mar 2012 - 02 Jul 2018 |
One Place Limited 43 Anzac Ave |
|
Faab Services Limited 43 Anzac Avenue |
|
One Property Management Limited 43 Anzac Avenue |
|
Family Counselling Service Trust 43 Anzac Avenue |
|
Cafe Ks Limited Suite 1, 49 Anzac Avenue |
|
Astus Boats Anz Limited 203-39 Anzac Ave |
Aurora Design Limited 2 Princes Street |
Mq2 Limited 316/10 Ronayne Street |
Transnational Innovations Limited Apartment 2107, 1 Courthouse Lane |
Meredith Limited Apartment 1506 Stamford Residences, 26 Albert Street |
Plum Design Limited Level 13, 34 Shortland Street |
Dow Group Limited Level 6, 12 Viaduct Harbour Ave |