Queensland Dream Limited (NZBN 9429030645486) was registered on 14 Jun 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 53 Mckerrow Street, Shiel Hill, Dunedin, 9013 (type: registered, physical). 2 Ballantyne Street, Waverley, Dunedin had been their physical address, up until 16 Oct 2019. 250 shares are allocated to 8 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 50 shares (20 per cent of shares), namely:
Henderson, Graham Edward (an individual) located at Dunedin postcode 9012,
Graham Henderson (a director) located at Dunedin postcode 9012. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 20 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Askerud, Peter (an individual) - located at Rd3, Gore,
Peter Askerud (a director) - located at Rd3, Gore. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (50 shares, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Nicholson, Jordan Robert, located at Shiel Hill, Dunedin (a director). "Investment - financial assets" (business classification K624040) is the classification the ABS issued Queensland Dream Limited. Our database was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
53 Mckerrow Street, Shiel Hill, Dunedin, 9013 | Registered & physical & service | 16 Oct 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Graham Weir
Rd 1, Dunedin, 9076
Address used since 06 Jan 2022
Waldronville, Dunedin, 9018
Address used since 14 Jun 2012 |
Director | 14 Jun 2012 - current |
Jordan Robert Nicholson
Shiel Hill, Dunedin, 9013
Address used since 08 Oct 2019
Waverley, Dunedin, 9013
Address used since 25 Nov 2012 |
Director | 14 Jun 2012 - current |
Peter Askerud
Rd3, Gore, 9773
Address used since 14 Jun 2012 |
Director | 14 Jun 2012 - 31 Jul 2012 |
Hamish Robert Weir
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 14 Jun 2012 |
Director | 14 Jun 2012 - 31 Jul 2012 |
Graham Edward Henderson
Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 14 Jun 2012 |
Director | 14 Jun 2012 - 31 Jul 2012 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2 Ballantyne Street, Waverley, Dunedin, 9013 | Physical & registered | 03 Dec 2012 - 16 Oct 2019 |
18 Hastings Street, Wakari, Dunedin, 9010 | Registered & physical | 14 Jun 2012 - 03 Dec 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Henderson, Graham Edward Individual |
Dunedin 9012 |
14 Jun 2012 - current |
Graham Edward Henderson Director |
Dunedin 9012 |
14 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Askerud, Peter Individual |
Rd3 Gore 9773 |
14 Jun 2012 - current |
Peter Askerud Director |
Rd3 Gore 9773 |
14 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholson, Jordan Robert Director |
Shiel Hill Dunedin 9013 |
14 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Weir, Paul Graham Director |
Rd 1 Dunedin 9076 |
14 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Weir, Hamish Robert Individual |
Rd 3 Gore 9773 |
14 Jun 2012 - current |
Hamish Robert Weir Director |
Rd 3 Gore 9773 |
14 Jun 2012 - current |
Fit Together Limited 59 Belford St |
|
Benadam Investments Limited 3 Belford Street |
|
Enigma 03 Limited 3 Belford Street |
|
Ultra Services Limited 3 Belford Street |
|
Braeside Trust 62 Belford Street |
|
Flying Sunset Limited 5 Belford Street |
Djh Limited 195 Musselburgh Rise |
Exbow Investments Limited 248 Cumberland Street |
Freedom Hair Limited Level 1 |
R & R Sport Wanaka Limited 70 Stuart Street |
Edgar Capital Managed Funds Limited Level 7 |
Edgar Capital Private Limited Level 7 John Wickliffe House |