Muskerry Farm Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030518117) was registered on 12 Sep 2012. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 81 Hokonui Drive, Gore, 9710 (type: physical, registered). 24 Main Street, Gore, Southland had been their physical address, up until 19 May 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Harrex Group Trustee Company 2007 Limited (an entity) located at Gore postcode 9710,
Lawlor, Brendan Ryan (a director) located at Rd 1, Outram postcode 9073. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
O'riordan, Teresa (a director) - located at Rd 3, Balclutha,
Lawlor, Matthew Brendan (a director) - located at Rd 3, Balclutha,
Harrex Group Trustee Company 2010 Limited (an entity) - located at Gore. "Property - non-residential - renting or leasing" (ANZSIC L671240) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Muskerry Farm Limited. Our information was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
81 Hokonui Drive, Gore, 9710 | Physical & registered & service | 19 May 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Matthew Brendan Lawlor
Rd 3, Balclutha, 9273
Address used since 29 Jul 2021
Rd 3, Balclutha, 9273
Address used since 12 Sep 2012 |
Director | 12 Sep 2012 - current |
Brendan Ryan Lawlor
Rd 1, Outram, 9073
Address used since 25 Oct 2022
Clinton, Clinton, 9534
Address used since 12 Sep 2012 |
Director | 12 Sep 2012 - current |
Teresa O'riordan
Rd 3, Balclutha, 9273
Address used since 29 Jul 2021
Rd 3, Balclutha, 9273
Address used since 12 Sep 2012 |
Director | 12 Sep 2012 - current |
Diane Lawlor
Rd 1, Outram, 9073
Address used since 25 Oct 2022
Clinton, Clinton, 9534
Address used since 12 Sep 2012 |
Director | 12 Sep 2012 - 15 May 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
24 Main Street, Gore, Southland, 0000 | Physical & registered | 12 Sep 2012 - 19 May 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harrex Group Trustee Company 2007 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033237619 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Gore 9710 |
12 Sep 2012 - current |
Lawlor, Brendan Ryan Director |
Rd 1 Outram 9073 |
12 Sep 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'riordan, Teresa Director |
Rd 3 Balclutha 9273 |
12 Sep 2012 - current |
Lawlor, Matthew Brendan Director |
Rd 3 Balclutha 9273 |
12 Sep 2012 - current |
Harrex Group Trustee Company 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031476461 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Gore 9710 |
12 Sep 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lawlor, Diane Individual |
Rd 1 Outram 9073 |
12 Sep 2012 - 18 Oct 2023 |
Blue Dinah Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
Terrace Hill Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
Frantzy Fencing Plus Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
L A Holdings 2013 Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
Harrex Group Trustee Company 2013 Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
Benio Downs Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
Rockford Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
Trl Properties Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
Bayswater Dairy Limited 22 Traford Street |
Ajax Building Contractors Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
NZ House Surveys Central Otago Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
Wendonside Holdings (no 2) Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |