Satellite Property Limited (NZBN 9429030516076) was launched on 25 Sep 2012. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 5 Havelock Road, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 (type: physical, registered). Cnr Eastbourne and Market Streets, Hastings had been their registered address, up until 21 Nov 2017. 120 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.83% of shares), namely:
Agnew, John Leslie (a director) located at Rd 5, Hastings postcode 4175. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.83% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Agnew, Susan Ann (a director) - located at Rd 5, Hastings. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (118 shares, 98.33%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Birrell, Martin, located at Ahuriri, Napier (an individual),
Agnew, John Leslie, located at Rd 5, Hastings (a director),
Agnew, Susan Ann, located at Rd 5, Hastings (a director). "Rental of commercial property" (business classification L671250) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Satellite Property Limited. Our information was updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5 Havelock Road, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 | Physical & registered & service | 21 Nov 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Susan Ann Agnew
Rd 5, Hastings, 4175
Address used since 25 Sep 2012 |
Director | 25 Sep 2012 - current |
John Leslie Agnew
Rd 5, Hastings, 4175
Address used since 25 Sep 2012 |
Director | 25 Sep 2012 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Cnr Eastbourne And Market Streets, Hastings, 4156 | Registered & physical | 03 Oct 2014 - 21 Nov 2017 |
Cnr Eastbourne And Market Streets, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical | 25 Sep 2012 - 03 Oct 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Agnew, John Leslie Director |
Rd 5 Hastings 4175 |
25 Sep 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Agnew, Susan Ann Director |
Rd 5 Hastings 4175 |
25 Sep 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Birrell, Martin Individual |
Ahuriri Napier 4110 |
25 Sep 2012 - current |
Agnew, John Leslie Director |
Rd 5 Hastings 4175 |
25 Sep 2012 - current |
Agnew, Susan Ann Director |
Rd 5 Hastings 4175 |
25 Sep 2012 - current |
Mapua Coastal Village Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Bruce Investments Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
On Trak Trustee Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Dames Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Newtons Flat Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Wg & Je Chambers Limited 5 Havelock Road |
Newtons Flat Limited 5 Havelock Road |
Bbs Pvt Limited 5 Havelock Road |
Eye Box Limited 5 Havelock Road |
Martin Place Properties Limited 13 Martin Place |
Dhillon Family Limited 58 James Cook Street |
Golden Hb Limited 1010 Heretaunga Street |