Croys Trustee Company No. 7 Limited (NZBN 9429030510784) was launched on 17 Sep 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 2, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 (type: registered, physical). 1000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Murdoch, Marcus John Burns (a director) located at Cashmere, Christchurch postcode 8022. Our data was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & physical & service | 17 Sep 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Marcus John Burns Murdoch
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 01 Jun 2021 |
Director | 01 Jun 2021 - current |
Anne Lynette Marett
Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 17 Sep 2012 |
Director | 17 Sep 2012 - 28 Jun 2021 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Murdoch, Marcus John Burns Director |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 |
07 Jul 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Marett, Anne Lynette Individual |
Ashburton 7700 |
17 Sep 2012 - 07 Jul 2021 |
Chris Bennett Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |
|
Get Wired Electrical Limited Level 1, 161 Burnett Street |
|
Viable Agriculture Limited Level 1, 208 Havelock Street |
|
Craigellachie Group Advisory Limited Level 1, 161 Burnett Street |
|
Methven Pubs Limited Level 1, 161 Burnett Street |
|
Wilce Engineering Limited Level 2, 161 Burnett Street |