Lar Trustee Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030476646) was launched on 18 Oct 2012. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 2 Celtic Crescent, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 (type: registered, physical). Level 6, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 21 Dec 2021. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Wilson, Jeremy Neville (a director) located at Ellerslie, Auckland postcode 1051. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Lar Trustee Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Suite A Floor 6, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Office | 04 Oct 2019 |
2 Celtic Crescent, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Dec 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeremy Neville Wilson
Torbay, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 09 Nov 2015
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 01 Nov 2017 |
Director | 18 Oct 2012 - current |
Carla Antonia Abade Rosa
Torbay, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 09 Nov 2015 |
Director | 18 Oct 2012 - 12 Sep 2016 |
Suite A Floor 6, 32 Mahuhu Crescent , Auckland Central , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 6, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 15 Dec 2014 - 21 Dec 2021 |
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 16 Jul 2014 - 15 Dec 2014 |
Level 6, 51 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 12 Dec 2013 - 16 Jul 2014 |
Whk, Level 6, 51-53 Shortland St, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 18 Oct 2012 - 12 Dec 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Jeremy Neville Director |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 |
23 Feb 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Abade Rosa, Carla Antonia Individual |
Torbay Auckland 0632 |
23 Feb 2015 - 12 Sep 2016 |
Gold Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034235256 Company Number: 1789389 Entity |
18 Oct 2012 - 23 Feb 2015 | |
Carla Antonia Abade Rosa Director |
Torbay Auckland 0632 |
23 Feb 2015 - 12 Sep 2016 |
Gold Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034235256 Company Number: 1789389 Entity |
18 Oct 2012 - 23 Feb 2015 |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
Hatton Trustee Services Limited Level 4, 21 Queen Street |
Manahau Properties Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
Kc Farms Trustee Limited Level 14, 41 Shortland Street |
Moore Park Trustee Limited 126 Vincent Street, Level 10 |
Gryphon Eight Investments Limited Level 7, 55 Shortland Street |