The Pony Express Limited (issued a business number of 9429030428898) was registered on 26 Nov 2012. 8 addresess are in use by the company: 75 Ridgetop Way, Rd4, Taupo, 3384 (type: postal, office). 78 Ridgetop Way, Rd 4, Taupo had been their physical address, up until 10 Jan 2018. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Williams, Shaye Russell (a director) located at Rd4, Taupo postcode 3384. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Mc Caughan, Morag Jane (a director) - located at Rd4, Taupo. "Agistment service - horses" (business classification A019110) is the classification the ABS issued to The Pony Express Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
78 Ridgetop Way, Rd4, Taupo, 3384 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 19 Dec 2016 |
75 Ridgetop Way, Rd 4, Taupo, 3384 | Physical & registered & service | 10 Jan 2018 |
75 Ridgetop Way, Rd4, Taupo, 3384 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 25 Nov 2018 |
75 Ridgetop Way, Rd4, Taupo, 3384 | Postal & office & delivery | 30 Nov 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shaye Russell Williams
Rd4, Taupo, 3384
Address used since 24 Dec 2017
Rd4, Taupo, 3384
Address used since 01 Jun 2016 |
Director | 26 Nov 2012 - current |
Morag Jane Mc Caughan
Rd4, Taupo, 3384
Address used since 01 Jun 2016
Rd4, Taupo, 3384
Address used since 24 Dec 2017 |
Director | 26 Nov 2012 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
75 Ridgetop Way, Rd4, Taupo, 3384 | Postal & office & delivery | 30 Nov 2019 |
75 Ridgetop Way , Rd4 , Taupo , 3384 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
78 Ridgetop Way, Rd 4, Taupo, 3384 | Physical & registered | 05 Jan 2017 - 10 Jan 2018 |
84 Ridgetop Way, Rd 4, Taupo, 3384 | Registered & physical | 26 Nov 2012 - 05 Jan 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Williams, Shaye Russell Director |
Rd4 Taupo 3384 |
26 Nov 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mc Caughan, Morag Jane Director |
Rd4 Taupo 3384 |
26 Nov 2012 - current |
Torkington Trustee Limited 753 Oruanui Road |
|
Just Law No. 60 Limited 753 Oruanui Road |
|
Just Law No. 59 Limited 753 Oruanui Road |
|
Omahina Partnership Limited 801 Oruanui Road |
|
Judgeford Holdings Limited 591 Oruanui Road |
|
Lake Lawn Services 1971 Limited 838 Oruanui Road |
Wake Field Equestrian Estate Limited 671 Te Matai Road |
Oxford Thoroughbreds Limited 14 Tui Street |
Fairweather Bloodstock Limited 14 Tui Street |
Brumby Farm Limited 466 Pirongia Road |
Brentwood Services Limited 42 Ewing Road |
Superior Farms Limited 2166 Buckland Road |