Matai Z Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030361447) was incorporated on 04 Feb 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 2 Clark Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: physical, service). 2 Clark Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin had been their physical address, up until 19 Aug 2020. Matai Z Limited used other names, namely: Bgd Three Limited from 01 Feb 2013 to 16 Apr 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Hyndman, Aileen Helen (an individual) located at Richmond, Richmond postcode 7020,
Cjc Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Dunedin Central, Dunedin postcode 9016,
Hyndman, Mathew Roger (an individual) located at Richmond, Richmond postcode 7020. "Rental of commercial property" (business classification L671250) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Matai Z Limited. Our database was updated on 15 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Clark Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & service & registered | 19 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mathew Roger Hyndman
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 10 May 2021
Waikanae Beach, Waikanae, 5036
Address used since 26 Mar 2021 |
Director | 26 Mar 2021 - current |
Aileen Helen Mackie-hyndman
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 16 Apr 2021 |
Director | 16 Apr 2021 - current |
Charles Julian Craw
Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010
Address used since 26 Mar 2021 |
Director | 26 Mar 2021 - 29 Mar 2021 |
Barry Vernon O'donnell
Rd 1, Port Chalmers, 9081
Address used since 04 Feb 2013 |
Director | 04 Feb 2013 - 26 Mar 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2 Clark Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered | 31 Aug 2016 - 19 Aug 2020 |
2 Clark Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 04 Feb 2013 - 31 Aug 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hyndman, Aileen Helen Individual |
Richmond Richmond 7020 |
26 Mar 2021 - current |
Cjc Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041247129 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
26 Mar 2021 - current |
Hyndman, Mathew Roger Individual |
Richmond Richmond 7020 |
26 Mar 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clarke Craw & Company Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037692872 Company Number: 940039 Entity |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
04 Feb 2013 - 26 Mar 2021 |
Clarke Craw & Company Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037692872 Company Number: 940039 Entity |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
04 Feb 2013 - 26 Mar 2021 |
Frankton Flats Investments Limited 2 Clark Street |
|
Bristol Street Investments Limited 2 Clark Street |
|
Mountain Ash Investments Limited 2 Clark Street |
|
Arm Eighty Seven Limited 2 Clark Street |
|
Revolution Software Limited 2 Clark Street |
|
Mp Holdings 12 Limited 2 Clark Street |
Imom Limited 2 Stafford Street |
Cromwell Junction Limited 433 Princes Street |
Mill Park Estate 60 Limited Level 7 John Wickliffe House |
Tong Chee Investments Limited Level 1, Plaza House |
D M Waldron Investment Limited 12 Lanark Street |
Argosy Holdings Limited 7 Bond Street |