Zuru Estates Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030294622) was incorporated on 26 Mar 2013. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 1/104 Rosedale Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (type: registered, physical). 188 Quay Street, Auckland had been their physical address, until 17 Aug 2020. 3000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
Mowbray, Nicholas James (an individual) located at Rd 3, Coatesville postcode 0793. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (1000 shares); it includes
Mowbray, Mathew Peter (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Hamilton. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (1000 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Mowbray, Anna Jane, located at Westmere, Auckland (an individual). "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is the category the ABS issued to Zuru Estates Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1/104 Rosedale Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 17 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Linda Elsie Mowbray
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 25 Aug 2014 |
Director | 26 Mar 2013 - current |
Harry Wyllie Mowbray
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 25 Aug 2014 |
Director | 26 Mar 2013 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1142 | Physical & registered | 23 May 2017 - 17 Aug 2020 |
45-49 Tirau Street, Putaruru, 3411 | Registered & physical | 26 Mar 2013 - 23 May 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mowbray, Nicholas James Individual |
Rd 3 Coatesville 0793 |
26 Mar 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mowbray, Mathew Peter Individual |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
26 Mar 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mowbray, Anna Jane Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
26 Mar 2013 - current |
F T P Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
Over The Moon Dairy Company Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
Red Dog Dairies Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
South Pro Woodlands Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
Twin Creeks Dairy Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
Beaver Contracting Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
Prd Holdings Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
Cherry Lea Trustees Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
Chadantes' Investments Limited 2 Churchill Street |
Arblay Investments Limited 213 Waiohotu Road |
Gibr Limited 1610 Maungatautari Road |
Literacy Courses NZ Limited 46 Aotea Crescent |