Park Street Trustees Number 23 Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030142824) was started on 11 Jul 2013. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 2 Memorial Square, Carterton, Carterton, 5713 (type: physical, service). 10 Park Street, Central Masterton, Masterton had been their registered address, up until 12 Aug 2021. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Barnes, Susan Emma (a director) located at Carterton, Carterton postcode 5713. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Bale, Michael George (a director) - located at Rd 1, Greytown. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Park Street Trustees Number 23 Limited. Our data was last updated on 31 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
P O Box 114, Masterton, 5840 | Postal | 19 Aug 2019 |
10 Park Street, Central Masterton, Masterton, 5840 | Office | 19 Aug 2019 |
2 Memorial Square, Carterton, Carterton, 5713 | Physical & service & registered | 12 Aug 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael George Bale
Rd 1, Greytown, 5794
Address used since 16 Jan 2019 |
Director | 16 Jan 2019 - current |
Susan Emma Barnes
Carterton, Carterton, 5713
Address used since 08 Jul 2022 |
Director | 08 Jul 2022 - current |
Mark Edward Hinton
Masterton, Masterton, 5810
Address used since 16 Jan 2019 |
Director | 16 Jan 2019 - 21 Jun 2023 |
Lindsay Boyd Gribben
Rd 11, Masterton, 5871
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 11 Jul 2013 - 16 Jan 2019 |
Avon George Jolly
Solway, Masterton, 5810
Address used since 11 Jul 2013 |
Director | 11 Jul 2013 - 20 Aug 2015 |
10 Park Street , Central Masterton , Masterton , 5840 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
10 Park Street, Central Masterton, Masterton, 5840 | Registered & physical | 13 Aug 2020 - 12 Aug 2021 |
10 Park Street, Central Masterton, Masterton, 5840 | Registered & physical | 04 Feb 2019 - 13 Aug 2020 |
10 Park Street,masterton, Masterton, 5840 | Physical & registered | 11 Jul 2013 - 04 Feb 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barnes, Susan Emma Director |
Carterton Carterton 5713 |
22 Jun 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bale, Michael George Director |
Rd 1 Greytown 5794 |
30 Jan 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hinton, Mark Edward Individual |
Masterton Masterton 5810 |
30 Jan 2019 - 22 Jun 2023 |
Gribben, Lindsay Boyd Individual |
Rd 11 Masterton 5871 |
11 Jul 2013 - 30 Jan 2019 |
Jolly, Avon George Individual |
Solway Masterton 5810 |
11 Jul 2013 - 25 Aug 2015 |
Avon George Jolly Director |
Solway Masterton 5810 |
11 Jul 2013 - 25 Aug 2015 |
Sinclair Family Cemetry Company Limited 10 Park Street |
|
Glen-cumbrae Trustees Limited 10 Park Street |
|
Waiteko Trustees Limited 10 Park Street |
|
Maungariki District Trust C/o Major Gooding & Partners |
|
Riobamba Holdings Limited Southeys Auto World Building |
Neil And Tina Day Trustee Company Limited 81 Queen Street |
A & C Wallace Family Trustees Limited 81 Queen Street |
Lgw Guardian Limited 1st Floor, 43 Chapel Street |
Carruthers Trustees Limited 16 Perry Street |
Marinowell's Trustee Limited Level 1 |
Jmb Trustees (2017) Limited Cnr Chapel & Perry Streets |