Riverton Butchery Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030053748) was started on 24 Sep 2013. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 20 Don Street, Invercargill, 9810 (type: registered, physical). 5 Jetty Street, Riverton, Riverton had been their registered address, until 06 Nov 2018. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Horrell, Nigel Rhys (a director) located at Rd 1, Riverton postcode 9881. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Horrell, Melissa Marie (a director) - located at Rd 1, Riverton. "Meat processing" (ANZSIC C111170) is the classification the ABS issued to Riverton Butchery Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 20 Don Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Registered & physical & service | 06 Nov 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nigel Rhys Horrell
Rd 1, Riverton, 9881
Address used since 25 Oct 2022
Rd 4, Invercargill, 9874
Address used since 24 Sep 2013 |
Director | 24 Sep 2013 - current |
Melissa Marie Horrell
Rd 1, Riverton, 9881
Address used since 25 Oct 2022
Rd 4, Invercargill, 9874
Address used since 24 Sep 2013 |
Director | 24 Sep 2013 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5 Jetty Street, Riverton, Riverton, 9822 | Registered & physical | 04 May 2018 - 06 Nov 2018 |
101 Don Street, Invercargill, Invercargill, 9810 | Physical & registered | 24 Sep 2013 - 04 May 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horrell, Nigel Rhys Director |
Rd 1 Riverton 9881 |
24 Sep 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horrell, Melissa Marie Director |
Rd 1 Riverton 9881 |
24 Sep 2013 - current |
Quality Towing Limited Level 1 |
|
Martyn Farming Limited Level 1 |
|
Southland Copier Company Limited Level 1 |
|
Tardis Properties Limited Level 1 |
|
Opio Carter Farms Limited Level 1 |
|
Oraka Point Holdings Limited Level 1 |
Southern Bungs Limited 102 Spey Street |
Blue Sky Meats (n.z.) Limited Level 1, 20 Don Street |
Snowden Limited 122 Otepuni Avenue |
Silver Fern Farms Co-operative Limited 283 Princes Street |
Silver Fern Farms Limited 283 Princes Street |
Silver Fern Farms Management Trustee Limited 283 Princes Street |