Tom West Risk Advisers Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030020351) was incorporated on 18 Oct 2013. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 252 Cumberland Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: office, delivery). 211 Doctors Point Road, Waitati had been their physical address, until 19 Sep 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Guest Carter Trustees Limited (an entity) located at 248 Cumberland Street, Dunedin postcode 9016,
West, Hugo Thomas (an individual) located at Dunedin Central, Dunedin postcode 9016. "Insurance agency service" (ANZSIC K642030) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Tom West Risk Advisers Limited. Our database was last updated on 14 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
252 Cumberland Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Sep 2018 |
252 Cumberland Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Office & delivery | 03 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Hugo Thomas West
Kaikorai, Dunedin, 9010
Address used since 18 Oct 2013
Rd 2, Waitati, 9085
Address used since 12 Sep 2017
Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016
Address used since 03 Sep 2019 |
Director | 18 Oct 2013 - current |
252 Cumberland Street , Dunedin Central , Dunedin , 9016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
211 Doctors Point Road, Waitati, 9085 | Physical & registered | 04 Oct 2017 - 19 Sep 2018 |
40 Oates Street, Kaikorai, Dunedin, 9010 | Physical & registered | 18 Oct 2013 - 04 Oct 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Guest Carter Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042370864 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
248 Cumberland Street Dunedin 9016 |
07 May 2018 - current |
West, Hugo Thomas Individual |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
18 Oct 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mulock, Amanda Christa Individual |
Kaikorai Dunedin 9010 |
18 Oct 2013 - 07 May 2018 |
Mulock, Amanda Christa Individual |
Kaikorai Dunedin 9010 |
18 Oct 2013 - 07 May 2018 |
Manoah Limited 3 Malta Street |
|
Simsys Limited 1 Gowry Place |
|
Sport Administration Esprit Incorporated 1 Gowry Place |
|
Glo Foods Limited Suite 2, 433 Stuart Street |
|
Keep It Crisp Limited Shop 2, 433 Stuart Street |
|
Jai Jwala Maa Limited 3/433 Stuart Street |
Korimako Insurance Services Limited Level 13, Otago House |
Fran Todd Insurance Limited 39 David Street |
Financial Services South Limited 118 Spey Street |
Kilworth Holdings Limited Level 1 |
Cathedral Financial Services Limited 45 Glandovey Road |
Abbott Underwriting Agency (holdings) Limited Level 2, Abbott House |