Dalton International Limited (issued a business number of 9429000024792) was launched on 15 Jan 1998. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Flat 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (type: physical, registered). Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 11 May 2017. 3010 shares are allocated to 10 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 1499 shares (49.8 per cent of shares), namely:
Canavan, Patricia Denise (an individual) located at Howick, Auckland postcode 2014,
Burn, Darryl James (an individual) located at Howick, Auckland postcode 2014,
Galbraiths Trustee Services Limited (an entity) located at Howick, Auckland postcode 2014. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.17 per cent of all shares (5 shares); it includes
Burn, Darryl James (an individual) - located at Howick, Auckland. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 0.03%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Canavan, Patricia Denise, located at Howick, Auckland (an individual). Businesscheck's data was last updated on 31 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Flat 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Physical & registered & service | 11 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Darryl James Burn
Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 25 May 2023
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 13 Dec 2022
Howick, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 01 Jul 2012 |
Director | 01 Jul 2012 - current |
Roger Dalton Burn
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 13 Dec 2022
Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 15 Jan 1998 |
Director | 15 Jan 1998 - 20 Mar 2023 |
Dingxiang Liu
Northpark, Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 26 Feb 1999 |
Director | 26 Feb 1999 - 31 Jan 2003 |
Liang Ren Li
Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 15 Jan 1998 |
Director | 15 Jan 1998 - 25 Aug 1998 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Physical & registered | 06 Jan 2003 - 11 May 2017 |
C/- Harts, Chartered Accountants, 1st Floor, Westpactrust Building, 19 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland | Registered & physical | 16 Feb 2002 - 06 Jan 2003 |
C/- Harts, Chartered Accountants, 1st Floor, Westpactrust Buildin, 19 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland | Physical | 27 Mar 2001 - 16 Feb 2002 |
2/3 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered | 27 Mar 2001 - 16 Feb 2002 |
2/3 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 27 Mar 2001 - 27 Mar 2001 |
Gilligan & Company Limited, 4th Floor Westpac Trust Building, 135 Broadway, Auckland | Registered & physical | 02 Jun 2000 - 27 Mar 2001 |
9 Adonis Place, Half Moon Bay, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 02 Jun 2000 |
C/- Harts, Chartered Accountants, 1st Floor, Westpac Building, 19 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland | Registered | 28 Mar 2000 - 12 Apr 2000 |
C/- Harts, Chartered Accountants, 1st Floor, Westpac Building, 19 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland | Physical | 27 Mar 2000 - 02 Jun 2000 |
9 Adonis Place, Half Moon Bay, Auckland | Registered | 10 Mar 1999 - 28 Mar 2000 |
9 Adonis Place, Half Moon Bay, Auckland | Physical | 10 Mar 1999 - 27 Mar 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Canavan, Patricia Denise Individual |
Howick Auckland 2014 |
31 Jul 2012 - current |
Burn, Darryl James Individual |
Howick Auckland 2014 |
31 Jul 2012 - current |
Galbraiths Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030738485 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Howick Auckland 2014 |
07 Aug 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burn, Darryl James Individual |
Howick Auckland 2014 |
31 Jul 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Canavan, Patricia Denise Individual |
Howick Auckland 2014 |
31 Jul 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burn, Roger Dalton Individual |
Half Moon Bay Auckland |
15 Jan 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burn, Catherine May Individual |
Half Moon Bay Auckland |
15 Jan 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burn, Roger Dalton Individual |
Half Moon Bay Auckland |
15 Jan 1998 - current |
Burn, Catherine May Individual |
Half Moon Bay Auckland |
15 Jan 1998 - current |
Jenkins, Colin Stuart Individual |
Christchurch |
15 Jan 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Public Trust Other |
31 Jul 2012 - 07 Aug 2013 | |
Null - Public Trust Other |
31 Jul 2012 - 07 Aug 2013 |
Eagles Hideaway Limited Level 1 |
|
Revive Finance Limited 26 Crummer Road |
|
Ambiance Impex Limited Flat 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Sita Propertyworld Real Estate Limited Flat 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Braidwood Trading Limited 26 Crummer Road |
|
Ufb Civil 2014 Limited 1/26 Crummer Road |