905 Family Trust Limited (NZBN 9429046439444) was incorporated on 06 Nov 2017. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, registered). Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 19 Sep 2019. 1 share is allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100% of shares), namely:
Phillips, Daniel Lade (a director) located at Milford, Auckland postcode 0620. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to 905 Family Trust Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 13 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 19 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Daniel Lade Phillips
Milford, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 07 Nov 2017
Belmont, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 06 Nov 2017 |
Director | 06 Nov 2017 - current |
Jessica Mary Gilmour
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 06 Nov 2017 |
Director | 06 Nov 2017 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 01 Apr 2019 - 19 Sep 2019 |
203 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 06 Nov 2017 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Phillips, Daniel Lade Director |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
06 Nov 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gulley, Stephen John Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
06 Nov 2017 - 21 Nov 2017 |
Virtusa Consulting & Services Pty Ltd Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road |
|
Kiran M Bhikha Limited Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road |
|
Wilson Partners (sharp) Trustee Limited Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road |
|
Home Healthcare Equipment Limited Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road |
|
Asaleo Holdings New Zealand Limited Level 2 |
|
Wilson Partners (grochowicz) Trustees Limited Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road |
Yu Xin Corporate Trustee Company Limited 1a George Street |
Neil Roberts Trustee Company Limited 81 Carlton Gore Road |
Amberley Trustees Limited 109 Carlton Gore Road |
Kolbe Trustee Limited 109 Carlton Gore Road |
Charis Trustees One Limited Level 2, Bupa House |
Charis Trustees Two Limited Level 2, Bupa House |