Dazzling Stars Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429046181398) was launched on 29 Jun 2017. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 61 Gelling Road, Rd 3, Drury, 2583 (type: registered, physical). 37 Wellfield Drive, Papakura, Papakura had been their registered address, up to 04 Jul 2022. Dazzling Stars Limited used other names, namely: Grover and Sandhu Trading Limited from 03 Jul 2017 to 05 Sep 2018, Grover Trading Limited (09 Jun 2017 to 03 Jul 2017). 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Grover, Kuldeep (a director) located at Rd 3, Drury postcode 2583. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Sra, Barinder Kaur (a director) - located at Papakura, Papakura. "Child care service" (business classification Q871010) is the category the ABS issued to Dazzling Stars Limited. Our database was last updated on 21 Jun 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
61 Gelling Road, Rd 3, Drury, 2583 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Barinder Kaur Sra
Rd 3, Drury, 2583
Address used since 01 Jul 2022
Papakura, Papakura, 2110
Address used since 01 Oct 2019 |
Director | 01 Oct 2019 - current |
Kuldeep Grover
Rd 3, Drury, 2583
Address used since 12 Jun 2022 |
Director | 12 Jun 2022 - current |
Kuldeep Grover
Schnapper Rock, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 29 Jun 2017
Broadway Street, Papakura, Auckland, 2100
Address used since 31 May 2019
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 30 Sep 2018 |
Director | 29 Jun 2017 - 07 Oct 2019 |
Gursharan Singh Sandhu
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 02 Jul 2017 |
Director | 02 Jul 2017 - 30 Aug 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
37 Wellfield Drive, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 | Registered & physical | 15 Oct 2019 - 04 Jul 2022 |
37 Wellfield Drive, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 | Physical & registered | 26 Aug 2019 - 15 Oct 2019 |
4/21 Broadway Street, Auckland, 02110 | Physical & registered | 08 Oct 2018 - 26 Aug 2019 |
Flat 1, 251 Forrest Hill Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Physical & registered | 13 Sep 2018 - 08 Oct 2018 |
Flat 1, 251 Forrest Hill Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 , New Zealand, Forest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Physical & registered | 07 Sep 2018 - 13 Sep 2018 |
71a Kittiwake Drive, Schnapper Rock, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical | 29 Jun 2017 - 07 Sep 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Grover, Kuldeep Director |
Rd 3 Drury 2583 |
08 Jul 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sra, Barinder Kaur Director |
Papakura Papakura 2110 |
07 Oct 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sandhu, Gursharan Singh Individual |
Forrest Hill Auckland 0620 |
04 Jul 2017 - 30 Aug 2018 |
Sra, Barinder Kaur Individual |
Schnapper Rock Auckland 0632 |
29 Jun 2017 - 30 Aug 2018 |
Grover, Kuldeep Individual |
Papakura Papakura 2110 |
29 Jun 2017 - 07 Oct 2019 |
Fan Real Estate Limited 69 Kittiwake Drive |
|
Effj Limited 122 Kittiwake Drive |
|
1963 Pty Limited 11 Rangi Avenue |
|
Sanrick Limited 75 Kittiwake Drive |
|
Toothdoc Limited 41 Kittiwake Drive |
|
Sgc Limited 41 Kittiwake Drive |
Sanrick Limited 75 Kittiwake Drive |
No-1 Property Limited 6 Tarndale Grove |
Homebased Childcare Education Group Limited 6 Tarndale Grove |
Milestone Education Limited 40 Caribbean Drive |
Coljen Limited 1 Lancaster Road |
Olsen Daycare Limited 5 William Laurie Place |