9Four Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429046054005) was incorporated on 03 Apr 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 18 Grey Street, College Estate, Whanganui, 4500 (type: registered, physical). 569 Carrington Road, Rd 1, New Plymouth had been their physical address, until 31 Mar 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 51 shares (51 per cent of shares), namely:
Novak, Alexander (a director) located at College Estate, Whanganui postcode 4500. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49 per cent of all shares (49 shares); it includes
Hogg, Tessa Kate (an individual) - located at College Estate, Whanganui. "Management consultancy service" (ANZSIC M696245) is the classification the ABS issued 9Four Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 03 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 Grey Street, College Estate, Whanganui, 4500 | Registered & physical & service | 31 Mar 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander Novak
College Estate, Whanganui, 4500
Address used since 10 Mar 2019
Rd 1, New Plymouth, 4371
Address used since 10 Mar 2019
Thorndon, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 03 Apr 2017
Rd 9, Halcombe, 4779
Address used since 02 Mar 2018 |
Director | 03 Apr 2017 - current |
18 Grey Street , College Estate , Whanganui , 4500 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
569 Carrington Road, Rd 1, New Plymouth, 4371 | Physical & registered | 18 Mar 2019 - 31 Mar 2021 |
29 Mingaroa Road, Rd 9, Halcombe, 4779 | Physical & registered | 13 Mar 2018 - 18 Mar 2019 |
115 Tory Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 12 Mar 2018 - 13 Mar 2018 |
115 Tory Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 03 Apr 2017 - 12 Mar 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Novak, Alexander Director |
College Estate Whanganui 4500 |
03 Apr 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hogg, Tessa Kate Individual |
College Estate Whanganui 4500 |
13 Jun 2017 - current |
Deighton & Deighton Engineering Limited 135 Mingaroa Road |
|
Pekapeka Maunga Whanau Charitable Trust 114 Pryces Line |
|
Taylor & Hutt Limited 210 Mt Biggs Road |
|
Te Roopu Hokowhitu Charitable Trust Board 122 Hastings Street |
|
Rock 2000 Limited 317 Mt Biggs Road |
|
Cusco Properties Limited 135 Fergusson Road |
Sm Holdings (2017) Limited 565 Wellington Road |
Duncrine Strategy & Governance Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
Downs Environmental Limited 6 Hair Street |
Full Potential Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
Ruku Limited 31 Fairview Avenue |
Parry Matthews & Associates Limited 221 Watershed Road |