Virtual Reality Studio Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429042364696) was started on 31 May 2016. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 42 Albionvale Road, Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602 (type: service, office). 42 Albionvale Road, Glen Eden, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 25 Oct 2017. 1000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 200 shares (20% of shares), namely:
Le Grice, Rob (a director) located at Mairangi Bay, Auckland postcode 0630. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 40% of all shares (exactly 400 shares); it includes
Leef, Jermaine (a director) - located at Auckland. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (400 shares, 40%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
White, Holly Jane, located at Glen Eden, Auckland (a director). "Entertainment centre operation" (business classification R900320) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Virtual Reality Studio Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
42 Albionvale Road, Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602 | Registered | 31 May 2016 |
Suite 2a, 161 Stoddard Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Physical | 25 Oct 2017 |
Suite 2a, 161 Stoddard Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Office | 27 Sep 2019 |
42 Albionvale Road, Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602 | Service | 25 Nov 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rob Le Grice
Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 31 May 2016 |
Director | 31 May 2016 - current |
Jermaine Leef
Auckland, 0602
Address used since 31 May 2016 |
Director | 31 May 2016 - current |
Holly Jane White
Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - current |
Shannon Peter Leef
Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - 27 Sep 2019 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
42 Albionvale Road, Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602 | Service | 25 Nov 2022 |
Suite 2a, 161 Stoddard Road , Mount Roskill , Auckland , 1041 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
42 Albionvale Road, Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602 | Physical | 31 May 2016 - 25 Oct 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Le Grice, Rob Director |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 |
31 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leef, Jermaine Director |
Auckland 0602 |
31 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
White, Holly Jane Director |
Glen Eden Auckland 0602 |
31 May 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leef, Shannon Peter Individual |
Glen Eden Auckland 0602 |
31 May 2018 - 27 Sep 2019 |
Universal Property Holding Limited Suite 4a, 161 Stoddard Road |
|
Families NZ Incorporated 161 Stoddard Road |
|
Globalwide Christian Trust Suite 1b/163 Stoddard Road |
|
Tititea Enterprises Trust C/o Business & Accting Solutions |
|
New Zealand Nejashi Trust Incorporated Top Floor 166 Stoddard Road |
|
Global Task (new Zealand) Trust 2b/163 Stoddard Road |
Yunlai Limited 11 Hillview Avenue |
NZ Huatong Company Limited 861a Dominion Road |
Identity Dance Company Limited 131 Shackleton Road |
Model Media Limited 15 Thomas Avenue |
Delete Limited 13 Paice Avenue |
Laser Tag West Limited 6-10 Jomac Place |