Czsgroup Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042288565) was registered on 21 Apr 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 3D Henry Rose Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (type: physical, registered). Suite 6, 35 Cook Street, Howick, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 19 Sep 2017. 100 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 35 shares (35 per cent of shares), namely:
Song, Chunjing (a director) located at Rd 3, Albany postcode 0793. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 35 per cent of all shares (35 shares); it includes
Zhang, Jie (a director) - located at Oteha, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (30 shares, 30%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Chen, Junan, located at Oteha, Auckland (an individual),
Junan Chen, located at Oteha, Auckland (a director). Businesscheck's database was last updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3d Henry Rose Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered & service | 19 Sep 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jie Zhang
Oteha, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 21 Apr 2016 |
Director | 21 Apr 2016 - current |
Chunjing Song
Rd 3, Albany, 0793
Address used since 21 Apr 2016 |
Director | 21 Apr 2016 - current |
Junan Chen
Oteha, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 24 Apr 2018 |
Director | 24 Apr 2018 - current |
Junan Chen
Oteha, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 21 Apr 2016 |
Director | 21 Apr 2016 - 29 Apr 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 6, 35 Cook Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & registered | 21 Apr 2016 - 19 Sep 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Song, Chunjing Director |
Rd 3 Albany 0793 |
21 Apr 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhang, Jie Director |
Oteha Auckland 0632 |
21 Apr 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chen, Junan Individual |
Oteha Auckland 0632 |
21 Apr 2016 - current |
Junan Chen Director |
Oteha Auckland 0632 |
21 Apr 2016 - current |
Elephant New Zealand Limited 3 Henry Rose Place |
|
Bitzer Australia Pty Limited 5-7 Henry Rose Place |
|
Polished Concrete Limited Unit 6, 7 Henry Rose Place |
|
Mega Diamond Tools Limited Unit 6, 7 Henry Rose Place |
|
Aquity International Limited Unit 9, 7 Henry Rose Place |
|
Ashmar Limited Unit K, 1 Henry Rose Place |