650 Great South Road Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042287391) was registered on 08 Apr 2016. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 181 No 3 Line, Whanganui East, Whanganui, 4500 (type: registered, service). Unit B3, 17 Corinthian Drive, Albany, Auckland had been their registered address, until 02 May 2018. 19300100 shares are issued to 43 shareholders who belong to 21 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 300000 shares (1.55% of shares), namely:
Westend, Peter (an individual) located at Waipapa, Waipapa postcode 0230,
David W Harrison Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Kerikeri postcode 0230,
Westend, Violet (an individual) located at Waipapa, Waipapa postcode 0230. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 1.3% of all shares (exactly 250000 shares); it includes
Reed, Fay (an individual) - located at One Tree Point, One Tree Point,
Fay Reed Trustee Company Limited (an entity) - located at Mount Eden, Auckland. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (500000 shares, 2.59%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Hc Trustees 2010 Limited, located at Timaru (an entity),
Rawlings, Leslie, located at Rd 4, Timaru (an individual). "Investment - commercial property" (business classification L671230) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to 650 Great South Road Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered | 02 May 2018 |
Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & service | 20 Aug 2018 |
181 No 3 Line, Whanganui East, Whanganui, 4500 | Registered & service | 08 Dec 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Geoffrey Hughson
Hawera, Hawera, 4610
Address used since 08 Apr 2016 |
Director | 08 Apr 2016 - current |
Neil James Tuffin
Wanganui East, Wanganui, 4500
Address used since 08 Apr 2016 |
Director | 08 Apr 2016 - current |
Bruce Charles Ellis
Rd 24, Stratford, 4394
Address used since 08 Apr 2016
Westown, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 10 Oct 2017 |
Director | 08 Apr 2016 - 19 Dec 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit B3, 17 Corinthian Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered | 08 Apr 2016 - 02 May 2018 |
Unit B3, 17 Corinthian Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Physical | 08 Apr 2016 - 20 Aug 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Westend, Peter Individual |
Waipapa Waipapa 0230 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
David W Harrison Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032715583 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Kerikeri 0230 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Westend, Violet Individual |
Waipapa Waipapa 0230 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reed, Fay Individual |
One Tree Point One Tree Point 0118 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Fay Reed Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047689138 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hc Trustees 2010 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031665803 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Timaru 7910 |
17 Jun 2022 - current |
Rawlings, Leslie Individual |
Rd 4 Timaru 7974 |
04 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Maat Consulting Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031682114 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whanganui East Whanganui 4500 |
08 Jul 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Parker, Sharon Individual |
Omokoroa Omokoroa 3114 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Clm Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036208098 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga 3110 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Dallas, Andrew Individual |
Omokoroa Omokoroa 3114 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cooper, Amanda Individual |
Riverlea Hamilton 3216 |
16 Sep 2019 - current |
Gerring, Elicia Individual |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 |
16 Sep 2019 - current |
Cooper, Sharon Individual |
Rd 1 Taupiri 3791 |
16 Sep 2019 - current |
J Law Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041647752 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
16 Sep 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Baker, Barbara Individual |
Rd 6 Whangarei 0176 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Baker, Paul Individual |
Rd 6 Whangarei 0176 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Carrington, Paul Individual |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 |
17 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Young, Judith Individual |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 |
04 Feb 2022 - current |
Young, Malcolm Individual |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 |
04 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morison, Jennifer Individual |
Rd 12 Havelock North 4294 |
04 Feb 2022 - current |
Morison, David Individual |
Rd 12 Havelock North 4294 |
04 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Moira Individual |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 |
04 Feb 2022 - current |
Higgott, Colin Individual |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brock, June Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
04 Feb 2022 - current |
Brock, Clinton Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
04 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jamieson, Robert Individual |
Glendowie Auckland 1071 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Jamieson, Elizabeth Individual |
Karaka Papakura 2113 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Jamieson, Ronald Individual |
Karaka Papakura 2113 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Donald Individual |
Greenlane Auckland 1061 |
08 Nov 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ewer, Timothy Individual |
Mapua 7173 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Ewer, Sally Individual |
Onetangi Waiheke Island 1081 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Ewer, Jonathan Individual |
Onetangi Waiheke Island 1081 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark, Margaret Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Clark, Nigel Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Richardson, Margaret Individual |
Rd 3 Tikokino 4273 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Richardson, Graeme Individual |
Rd 5 Hastings 4175 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Richardson, Bryan Individual |
Rd 3 Tikokino 4273 |
29 Jul 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris, Leslie Individual |
Glen Eden Auckland 0602 |
06 Jul 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ash Mac Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040790640 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mount Victoria Wellington 6011 |
05 Jul 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bramasole Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031793735 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mangawhai Heads Mangawhai 0505 |
05 Jul 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Floteck Consultants Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039785695 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 4 New Plymouth 4374 |
05 Jul 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Newton, Charles Individual |
Hillmorton Christchurch 8025 |
07 Jul 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Trust, Dallas Parker No. 2 Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Morison, David And Jennifer Individual |
Havelock 4294 |
07 Jul 2016 - 04 Feb 2022 |
Young, Malcolm And Judith Individual |
Otumoetai 0618 |
11 Jul 2016 - 04 Feb 2022 |
Hubbard Churcher Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037867881 Company Number: 903425 Entity |
04 Feb 2022 - 17 Jun 2022 | |
Welham, Michael And Sheryll Individual |
Christchurch 8052 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Pease, Lesley Individual |
New Plymouth 4310 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Hubbard Churcher Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037867881 Company Number: 903425 Entity |
Timaru 7910 |
04 Feb 2022 - 17 Jun 2022 |
Williamson, Michael Individual |
Rd 1 Alexandra 9391 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Matthews, Michael Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Erb, Wendy Individual |
Rd 1 New Plymouth 4371 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Shimobaba, Noriko Individual |
Rd 4 Whakatane 3194 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Knight, Jeffrey Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Clark, Nigel And Margaret Individual |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 |
05 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Bell, Bruce And Carol Individual |
Red Beach Red Beach 0932 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Clarke, Allan Individual |
Unsworth Heights Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Bellringer, Ec And Cp Individual |
Rd 3 New Plymouth 4373 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Erwyn Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032332773 Company Number: 2223048 Entity |
Rd 4 Wellsford 0974 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Knight, Estate Of Cjp Individual |
Masterton 5882 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Henderson, Michael Individual |
Blenhiem 0627 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Kettlewell Individual |
Oakura Oakura 4314 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Lorbyrne Individual |
Highlands Park New Plymouth 4312 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Morrison, Fergus Individual |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Positron Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030091863 Company Number: 4605699 Entity |
Golflands Auckland 2013 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Seaview Corporation Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035083412 Company Number: 1576278 Entity |
Paremata Wellington |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Steere, William Individual |
Heretaunga Upper Hutt 5018 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Verrion-clarke, Christine Individual |
Leamington Cambridge 3432 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Reed Investment Trust Other |
Titirangi Auckland 0604 |
11 Apr 2017 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Ellis, Lorraine Individual |
Westown New Plymouth 4310 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Gr And Jm Hay Family Individual |
Waiareka Junction Oamaru 9401 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Silk Beech Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031454162 Company Number: 3033040 Entity |
Rd 1 Richmond 7081 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Macdonald, Robert Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Carpenter, Bryan Individual |
Matua Tauranga 3110 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Duncan, Geoffrey Individual |
Hillmorton Christchurch 8024 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Cannon, Leslie And Jean Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Carpenter, Robin Individual |
Matua Tauranga 3110 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Bodt, Steven Individual |
Auckland 1010 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Holland, Harry And Marilyn Individual |
Paremata Porirua 5024 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Murray, Laurence Individual |
Tokoroa Tokoroa 3420 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Meadowbank Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Overall, Janet Individual |
Richmond Heights Taupo 3330 |
11 May 2018 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Rds Individual |
Titirangi Auckland 0604 |
11 Jul 2016 - 11 Apr 2017 |
Cato Family Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032326222 Company Number: 2224677 Entity |
Waimaiku Auckland 0842 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Nov 2019 |
Seaview Corporation Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035083412 Company Number: 1576278 Entity |
Paremata Wellington |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Positron Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030091863 Company Number: 4605699 Entity |
Golflands Auckland 2013 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Weir, Duncan And Margaret Individual |
Hawera Hawera 4610 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Malone, Patricia Individual |
Stratford Stratford 4332 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
I.b. & J.l. Mccutcheon Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040127873 Company Number: 184356 Entity |
Tauranga 3110 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Erwyn Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032332773 Company Number: 2223048 Entity |
Rd 4 Wellsford 0974 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Goodwin, Trevor And Jill Individual |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Stoneburn Individual |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Garlick, Gay Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Haycock, Kenneth Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Necol Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030756441 Company Number: 3747695 Entity |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Chevron Building Ltd Other |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
06 Jun 2017 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Lane Family Individual |
Rd 1 Katikati 3177 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Lazbo Family Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Bethell, Peter Individual |
Rd 1 Christchurch 7671 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Maat Consulting Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031682114 Company Number: 2396577 Entity |
08 Apr 2016 - 11 Jul 2016 | |
Trust, The Townhouse Individual |
Rd 3 Alexandra 9393 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Mcgregor, Graeme Individual |
Birkdale Auckland 0626 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, K And M Feeney Family Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Clarke, Beth Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Holmes Individual |
Rd 9 Te Puke 3189 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Green, Peter Individual |
Rd 4 Rotorua 3074 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Hargraves, Simon Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, B And R Carpenter Individual |
Matua Tauranga 3110 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Wingate, Graeme Individual |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Barber, John Individual |
Pukerua Bay Pukerua Bay 5026 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust M, La Dell Farm Individual |
Rd 3 Te Awamutu 3873 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Alpha-gmp Prographics Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036507061 Company Number: 1208795 Entity |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8014 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Empson, Cameron And Aotea Individual |
Rd 5 Te Awamutu 3875 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Chylek, Eugene Individual |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4312 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Gordon Enterprises Individual |
Rd 1 Blenheim 7271 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Ramsey Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033037486 Company Number: 2055125 Entity |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Waiata Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038622373 Company Number: 644467 Entity |
Rd 2 Masterton |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Jr Ewer Family Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
06 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Packer, Bruce Individual |
Wellington 6035 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Deeks And Stanley, Lewis And Wendy Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 11 Apr 2017 |
Peter, Keller Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Glenro Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Wheater, Robert And Joanne Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Mundell, Lois Individual |
Western Heights Hamilton 3200 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
I.b. & J.l. Mccutcheon Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040127873 Company Number: 184356 Entity |
Tauranga 3110 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Jamieson Family Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
06 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Jones, Judith Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, The Metzener Individual |
Dargaville Dargaville 0310 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Brookes Computing Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037361037 Company Number: 1016081 Entity |
Rangiora |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Mariposa Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030847736 Company Number: 3687756 Entity |
Port Chalmers 9023 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Bk Carpenter Individual |
Matua Tauranga 3110 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Bowers, John Individual |
Paparangi Wellington 6037 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Packer, Jan Individual |
Wainuiomata Lower Hutt 5014 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Brookes Computing Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037361037 Company Number: 1016081 Entity |
Rangiora |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Bean, Derek Individual |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Bateman, Donald And Janet Individual |
Westshore Napier 4110 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Kigle Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Mmah Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042020080 Company Number: 5829157 Entity |
Wainuiomata Lower Hutt 5014 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Ranjan, Rohini Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Baker Family Individual |
Matarau Kamo 0185 |
05 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Raynel, Peter Individual |
Rd 1 Paeroa 3671 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, C J Higgott Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Dunlop, Andrew Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Jones, Donald Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Lamb, David Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
No2, P.a. Westend Trust Individual |
Rd 2 Kerikeri 0295 |
11 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Smith, Deborah Individual |
Rd 5 Feilding 4775 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Stewart, Janet Individual |
Taupo Taupo 3330 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Tanner, Noel Individual |
Sunnyhills Auckland 2010 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, The Montecello Individual |
Bellevue Tauranga 3110 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
White, Walton Individual |
Hutt Central Lower Hutt 5010 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Wyatt, Kevin Individual |
Judea Tauranga 3110 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Wong, Mary Individual |
Miramar Wellington 6022 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Wright, William Individual |
Paeroa Paeroa 3600 |
11 Jul 2016 - 06 Jun 2017 |
Symister, Aliya Individual |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 |
11 Jul 2016 - 06 Jun 2017 |
Maat Consulting Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031682114 Company Number: 2396577 Entity |
08 Apr 2016 - 11 Jul 2016 | |
Mclennan, Janet Individual |
Te Kuiti 3981 |
07 Jul 2016 - 11 May 2018 |
Chylek, Barbara Individual |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4312 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Goode Family Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Caldwell, Betty Individual |
Murrays Bay Auckland 0630 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Oulsnam, Warwick And Deborah Individual |
Merrilands New Plymouth 4312 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, P And D Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, The B And K O'brien Family Individual |
Rd 2 Silverdale 0992 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Craig, Murray And Janice Individual |
Rd 5 Tauranga 3175 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Jamieson Family Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
06 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Turner, Richard And Marrilyn Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Norman, Roger Individual |
Christchurch 8051 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Mmah Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042020080 Company Number: 5829157 Entity |
Wainuiomata Lower Hutt 5014 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Farms, Paalvast Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Rodewald, Wendy Individual |
Rd 3 Drury 2579 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Stansfield, Francis And Valerie Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Ainge, William Individual |
Gore 9710 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Alpha-gmp Prographics Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036507061 Company Number: 1208795 Entity |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8014 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Bayne, Glenys Individual |
Normandale Lower Hutt 5010 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Charteris, Marilyn Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Silk Beech Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031454162 Company Number: 3033040 Entity |
Rd 1 Richmond 7081 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Morriss, Clyde And Gloria Individual |
Tamahere Hamilton 3284 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, The Miclynant Individual |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Mariposa Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030847736 Company Number: 3687756 Entity |
Port Chalmers 9023 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Kinney Jones Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037088095 Company Number: 1099746 Entity |
Ponsonby Auckland |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Necol Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030756441 Company Number: 3747695 Entity |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Hargraves, Peter Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Hartiill And Neilson, Timothy And Clare Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Adlard Nicholls, Roy And Jeanne Individual |
St Georges Cresent Port Erin, Isle Of Man 000 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Bellringer, Peter And Patricia Individual |
Rd 2 New Plymouth 4372 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, B F And M Richardson Family Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 29 Jul 2021 |
Brock, Clinton And June Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
05 Jul 2016 - 04 Feb 2022 |
Trust, Leslie Rawlings Individual |
Rd 4 Timaru 7974 |
07 Jul 2016 - 04 Feb 2022 |
Mcgirr, Lewis Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Cape Pioneer Individual |
Moturoa New Plymouth 4310 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Huston, Janice Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Boyer, Lawrence And Kathleen Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Craig, Max Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Gyde, Pearl Individual |
Henderson Auckland 0612 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Pv Overall Family Individual |
Te Kuiti 3981 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Rodewald, Jacqueline Individual |
Rd 4 Katikati 3181 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Scokat Individual |
Rd 4 Tauranga 3174 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Kinney Jones Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037088095 Company Number: 1099746 Entity |
Ponsonby Auckland |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Trevor Robson No2 Family Individual |
One Tree Point One Tree Point 0118 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Tilyard, Clement And Adrienne Individual |
Tuakau 2121 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Danstrup Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037202378 Company Number: 1047432 Entity |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Alison Sampson Individual |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Collins, Desmond Individual |
Thorndon Wellington 6011 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Jr Dickins Family Individual |
Rd 5 Feilding 4775 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Shepreth Individual |
Waikanae Beach Waikanae 5036 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Partnership, Pl And Ee Skilton Trust Individual |
Rd 4 Papakura 2584 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Witherview Estate Individual |
Hospital Hill Napier 4110 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Cato Family Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032326222 Company Number: 2224677 Entity |
Waimaiku Auckland 0842 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Nov 2019 |
Ramsey Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033037486 Company Number: 2055125 Entity |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Waiata Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038622373 Company Number: 644467 Entity |
Rd 2 Masterton |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Erb, Michael Individual |
Rd 1 New Plymouth 4371 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Halliday, Ardell Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Winter, Beverley Individual |
Rolleston Rolleston 7615 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Hall, Maurice And Ann Individual |
Hastings Hastings 4122 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Ld, Young Group Individual |
Epuni Lower Hutt 5011 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Mcewan, Andrew Individual |
Christchurch 8014 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Gunn, Barrie And Cecilia Individual |
Fairview Heights Auckland 0632 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Walton, Richard Individual |
Timaru 7910 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, The Graham And Fiona White Family Individual |
Devonport Auckland 0624 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Mercer, Anthony And Kathleen Individual |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Robertson, Ian And Denise Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, R.g. And J.m. Chandler Family Individual |
Silverstream Upper Hutt 5019 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, R.j. Mcsheffrey Family Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Betts, Kelda Individual |
Kerikeri Kerikeri 0230 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Anderson, Helen Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Walters, Kevin And Jean Individual |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Lewen Number Two Trust Other |
Birkenhead Auckland 0626 |
11 Apr 2017 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Sh Bruce Family Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Stoney Creek Individual |
Maori Hill Timaru 7910 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Lapthorne, Barry And Rhonda Individual |
Avonside Christchurch 8061 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, R And R Individual |
Rd 15 Hawera 4675 |
11 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Ar And Ar Bell Family Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Danstrup Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037202378 Company Number: 1047432 Entity |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Leonard, John Individual |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
07 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Do And Jm Topliss Family Individual |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 |
05 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Johnson, Mark Individual |
Mangakakahi 3015 |
06 Jul 2016 - 08 Jul 2019 |
Trust, Bk And Spm Cooper Family Individual |
Taupiri Taupiri 3791 |
05 Jul 2016 - 16 Sep 2019 |
Rgh Financial Services Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |
|
Phoenix Drive Property Investments Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |
|
Walton Plaza Investments Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |
|
Osterley Way Investments Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |
|
Cameron Road Property Investment Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |
|
Kealoha Limited 17c Corinthian Drive |
Phoenix Drive Property Investments Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |
Walton Plaza Investments Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |
Osterley Way Investments Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |
Cameron Road Property Investment Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |
Lewis Investments Limited 17c Corinthian Drive |
The Hub Properties Limited Unit B4, 17 Corinthian Drive |