68 Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429042034322) was launched on 21 Oct 2015. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 9579, Newmarket, Auckland, 1149 (type: postal, office). Level 3, 30 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland had been their physical address, until 11 Sep 2020. 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Smith, Michael Thomas (a director) located at Westmere, Auckland postcode 1022. "Rental of commercial property" (ANZSIC L671250) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to 68 Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 11 Sep 2020 |
Po Box 9579, Newmarket, Auckland, 1149 | Postal | 21 Sep 2021 |
Level 2, 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Office & delivery | 21 Sep 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Thomas Smith
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 21 Oct 2015 |
Director | 21 Oct 2015 - current |
Jennifer Elizabeth Smith
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 01 Mar 2017 |
Director | 01 Mar 2017 - current |
Level 2, 18 Broadway , Newmarket , Auckland , 1023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 30 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 | Physical | 29 Sep 2017 - 11 Sep 2020 |
Level 3, 30 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 | Registered | 03 Nov 2016 - 11 Sep 2020 |
Level 3, 30 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 | Physical | 21 Oct 2015 - 29 Sep 2017 |
Level 3, 30 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 | Registered | 21 Oct 2015 - 03 Nov 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smith, Michael Thomas Director |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
21 Oct 2015 - current |
Latitude Commodities Limited Level 1, 1-3 Cowan St |
|
Acl Trustees 2012 Limited Level 1, 283 Ponsonby Rd |
|
Wake Farm Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 14 Jervois Road |
|
Sciascia Brothers Limited Level 1, 56 Brown Street |
|
Acl Trustees 2010 Limited Level 1, 283 Ponsonby Road |
|
Ola Trustee Company Limited Level One, 33 Ponsonby Road |
Changehaven Properties Limited 31 Wanganui Avenue |
Heritage Property Management Limited 10 Trinity Street |
24/7 Property Group Holdings Limited 19e Blake Street |
Lucy Anne Limited 19e Blake Street |
Short Street Investments Limited 9 Redmond Street |
3 Lamps Plaza Limited 10 Cameron Street |