8 Starz Holdings Limited (issued a business number of 9429042029724) was launched on 19 Oct 2015. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 37 Carillon Place, Massey, Auckland, 0614 (type: office, postal). 37 Carillon Place, Massey, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 18 Jan 2018. 100 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 25 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Luka, Hipa (an individual) located at Massey, Auckland postcode 0614. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25% of all shares (exactly 25 shares); it includes
Ianuali, Luka (an individual) - located at Massey, Auckland. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (25 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Luka, Teafolupe Meleaulo, located at Massey, Auckland (an individual). "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (business classification K624030) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to 8 Starz Holdings Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
37 Carillon Place, Massey, Auckland, 0614 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Jan 2018 |
37 Carillon Place, Massey, Auckland, 0614 | Postal & delivery | 09 Apr 2019 |
37 Carillon Place, Massey, Auckland, 0614 | Office | 13 May 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Teafolupe Luka
Massey, Auckland, 0614
Address used since 20 Mar 2017 |
Director | 20 Mar 2017 - current |
Luao Luka
Massey, Auckland, 0614
Address used since 02 Mar 2016 |
Director | 19 Oct 2015 - 31 Mar 2017 |
37 Carillon Place , Massey , Auckland , 0614 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
37 Carillon Place, Massey, Auckland, 0614 | Registered & physical | 10 Mar 2017 - 18 Jan 2018 |
37 Carillon Place, Massey, Auckland, 0614 | Registered & physical | 10 Mar 2016 - 10 Mar 2017 |
37 Carillon Place, Auckland, 0614 | Registered & physical | 19 Oct 2015 - 10 Mar 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Luka, Hipa Individual |
Massey Auckland 0614 |
19 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ianuali, Luka Individual |
Massey Auckland 0614 |
13 Aug 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Luka, Teafolupe Meleaulo Individual |
Massey Auckland 0614 |
19 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Luao, Melemailevai Individual |
Massey Auckland 0614 |
24 Mar 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Luka, Luao Individual |
Auckland 0614 |
19 Oct 2015 - 24 Mar 2017 |
Luka, Pelosi Individual |
Massey Auckland 0614 |
19 Oct 2015 - 13 Aug 2020 |
Luao Luka Director |
Auckland 0614 |
19 Oct 2015 - 24 Mar 2017 |
Kauther Security Limited 14 Carillon Place |
|
Auckland Yang Moo Ree Church 21 Bellringer Road |
|
One Step Forward Trust (osft) 57 Triangle Road |
|
Jin Tiling Limited 9 Bellringer Road |
|
Jyoti Good News (assembly Of God) Trust Board 26 Bellringer Road |
|
Taikoo Property Management Limited 35a Mcclintock Road |
Lifestyle Trust Limited 108 D Colwill Road |
Vista Vedder Trustee Limited 7 Belvedere Court |
Exeloo Holdings Limited 26 Paramount Drive |
International Holdings Limited 749a Te Atatu Road, |
Lfh Limited 24 Westpark Drive |
Thinz Investment Holding Limited 26 Frank Evans Place |