Nz Dwellings Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041319482) was incorporated on 10 Jul 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 5/36 William Pickering Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 (type: physical, service). 112 Bush Road, Albany, Auckland had been their registered address, until 04 May 2017. Nz Dwellings Limited used other names, namely: Dwellings Limited from 07 Jul 2014 to 29 Aug 2014. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Groenewald, Janelle (a director) located at Rd 5, Wellsford postcode 0975. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Charl Groenewald (a director) - located at Rd 5, Wellsford,
Groenewald, Charl Gabriel (an individual) - located at Rd 5, Wellsford. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Nz Dwellings Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5/36 William Pickering Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & service & registered | 04 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Janelle Groenewald
Rd 5, Wellsford, 0975
Address used since 15 Feb 2017 |
Director | 15 Feb 2017 - current |
Charl Gabriel Groenewald
Rd 5, Mangawhai, 0975
Address used since 01 Jul 2019 |
Director | 01 Jul 2019 - current |
Pieter Gerbrand Steyn Groenewald
Heilbron, 9650
Address used since 06 Sep 2017 |
Director | 21 May 2015 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Charl Gabriel Groenewald
Rd 5, Wellsford, 0975
Address used since 10 Jul 2014 |
Director | 10 Jul 2014 - 18 Feb 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
112 Bush Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical | 03 Dec 2015 - 04 May 2017 |
208 Cames Road, Rd 5, Wellsford, 0975 | Registered & physical | 10 Jul 2014 - 03 Dec 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Groenewald, Janelle Director |
Rd 5 Wellsford 0975 |
10 Jun 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Charl Gabriel Groenewald Director |
Rd 5 Wellsford 0975 |
10 Jul 2014 - current |
Groenewald, Charl Gabriel Individual |
Rd 5 Wellsford 0975 |
10 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Groenewald, Pieter Gerbrand Steyn Individual |
Heilbron 9650 |
09 Jun 2015 - 26 Jul 2019 |
Nesti Trustees Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Dwellings Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Precision Plumbing Auckland Limited Unit 5, 36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Precision Plumbing North Shore Limited Unit 5, 36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Utility Mapping Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Nesti Chartered Accountants Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
Dwellings Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
Burgess Developments Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
Delamare Lawyers Limited 5/36, William Pickering Drive |
St Industrial Investments Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
Medal Properties 2017 Limited Unit 5, 36 William Pickering Drive |
Ultimate Property NZ Limited 11c Douglas Alexander Parade |