Ectara Enterprises Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429040993959) was started on 11 Nov 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 65 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 (type: registered, physical). 52 Northcote Road, Northcote, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 13 Oct 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Rosebank Road Medical Services Limited (an entity) located at Avondale, Auckland postcode 1026. "Motel operation" (business classification H440045) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Ectara Enterprises Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
65 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Oct 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Geeta Murali Ganesh
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 09 Sep 2016 |
Director | 09 Sep 2016 - current |
Hemalatha Murthy
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 01 Oct 2015 |
Director | 11 Nov 2013 - 28 Apr 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
52 Northcote Road, Northcote, Auckland, 0627 | Physical | 14 Oct 2021 - 13 Oct 2022 |
119 Ladies Mile, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 | Physical | 19 Sep 2016 - 14 Oct 2021 |
377 Marine Parade, Napier South, Napier, 4110 | Physical | 11 Nov 2013 - 19 Sep 2016 |
377 Marine Parade, Napier South, Napier, 4110 | Registered | 11 Nov 2013 - 13 Oct 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rosebank Road Medical Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038495038 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Avondale Auckland 1026 |
28 Apr 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Murali Ganesh, Geeta Director |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 |
04 Oct 2016 - 28 Apr 2017 |
Hemalatha Murthy Director |
Napier 4110 |
11 Nov 2013 - 28 Apr 2017 |
Murthy, Hemalatha Individual |
Napier 4110 |
11 Nov 2013 - 28 Apr 2017 |
Mainstreet Arts Council Trust 460 Hastings Street |
|
Jls Trading Limited 422 Hastings Street |
|
Te Kupenga Hauora-ahuriri 5 Sale Street |
|
Ranges & Rivers Limited 321 Marine Parade |
|
Tedlene Hospitality Limited 311 Marine Parade |
|
Civic Centre Social Club Incorporated C/o Napier City Council |
Db Decor Limited 16 Nelson Crescent |
Laxey Glen Holdings Limited 106 A Kennedy Road |
Laxey Glen Motels Limited 106 A Kennedy Road |
Harbour View (2013) Limited 86 Ford Road |
A R Holding NZ Limited 19 Meeanee Quay |
Ace High Motel (2013) Limited 399 Kennedy Road |