Hamilton Truck & Bus Parts Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038834875) was started on 09 Jul 1993. 6 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 5659, Frankton, Hamilton, 3242 (type: invoice, office). 1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton had been their registered address, until 17 Aug 2018. 250000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 175000 shares (70 per cent of shares), namely:
Wymer Brothers Limited (an entity) located at Whitiora, Hamilton postcode 3200. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 30 per cent of all shares (75000 shares); it includes
Jeanes, John Adrian (an individual) - located at Glenview, Hamilton. "Motor vehicle part dealing - new" (business classification F350430) is the classification the ABS issued Hamilton Truck & Bus Parts Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 26 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Registered | 17 Aug 2018 |
1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Physical & service | 12 Sep 2018 |
Po Box 5659, Frankton, Hamilton, 3242 | Postal | 19 Sep 2019 |
18c Ellis Street, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 | Delivery | 19 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Adrian Jeanes
Glenview, Hamilton, 3206
Address used since 29 Sep 2006 |
Director | 29 Sep 2006 - current |
Kevin James Wymer
Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 24 Sep 2015 |
Director | 08 Aug 2008 - current |
Richard Clark Wymer
Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 21 Sep 2018
Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 24 Sep 2015
Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 20 Sep 2017 |
Director | 08 Aug 2008 - current |
Brian Raymond Hannam
Westmere, Auckland,
Address used since 09 Jul 1993 |
Director | 09 Jul 1993 - 01 Jul 2010 |
John Allan Mcclennan
Hamilton,
Address used since 09 Jul 1993 |
Director | 09 Jul 1993 - 08 Aug 2008 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
18c Ellis Street, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 | Delivery | 19 Sep 2019 |
Po Box 5659, Frankton, Hamilton, 3242 | Invoice | 28 Sep 2021 |
18c Ellis Street, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 | Office | 28 Sep 2021 |
18c Ellis Street , Frankton , Hamilton , 3204 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Registered | 24 Sep 2013 - 17 Aug 2018 |
1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Physical | 24 Sep 2013 - 12 Sep 2018 |
25-27 Ellis Street, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 | Physical & registered | 22 Sep 2010 - 24 Sep 2013 |
25/27 Ellis Road, Hamilton | Physical & registered | 01 Sep 2009 - 22 Sep 2010 |
25 Ellis Street, Frankton, Hamilton | Physical | 08 May 2009 - 01 Sep 2009 |
4a Keddell Street, Hamilton | Physical | 28 Oct 1998 - 08 May 2009 |
6 Birwood Place, Hamilton | Physical | 28 Oct 1998 - 28 Oct 1998 |
6 Birwood Place, Hamilton | Registered | 06 Oct 1997 - 01 Sep 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wymer Brothers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037302948 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whitiora Hamilton 3200 |
28 Aug 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeanes, John Adrian Individual |
Glenview Hamilton |
04 Oct 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Davie Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039697516 Company Number: 317089 Entity |
09 Jul 1993 - 21 Aug 2006 | |
Davie Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039697516 Company Number: 317089 Entity |
09 Jul 1993 - 21 Aug 2006 | |
Davie Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039697516 Company Number: 317089 Entity |
04 Oct 2006 - 01 Jul 2010 | |
Mcclennan, John Allan Individual |
Hamilton |
09 Jul 1993 - 28 Aug 2008 |
Davie Properties Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039697516 Company Number: 317089 Entity |
04 Oct 2006 - 01 Jul 2010 |
Ikon Commercial Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Drainage Systems Auckland Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Freedom In Peace Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Zillkes Medical Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Distribution Gp Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Firth Developments Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
Whites Powersports Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
Spraybooth Filters Limited 942 Churchill East Road |
House Of Custom Limited 17 Francis Street |
Anaconda (1993) Limited 1 Princes Street |
4x4 Stuff Limited 23 Revell Drive |
Speedfactor Limited 3 St John Street |