It360 Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038389283) was launched on 12 Dec 1995. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 5, 205 Wairau Road, Wairau Valley, Auckland, 0627 (type: physical, registered). 19 Tatyana Place, Massey, Auckland had been their registered address, until 25 Jun 2018. It360 Limited used more aliases, namely: M.i.s. Services Limited from 11 Jun 2008 to 08 Feb 2010, M.i.s. Services New Zealand Limited (12 Dec 1995 to 11 Jun 2008). 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (1% of shares), namely:
Wilson, Christine Ruth (an individual) located at Royal Heights, Auckland postcode 0614. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Wilson, Victor Corbett David (an individual) - located at Royal Heights, Auckland. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allocation (98 shares, 98%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Jones, Clifford Rex, located at Mount Eden, Auckland (an individual),
Wilson, Christine Ruth, located at Royal Heights, Auckland (an individual),
Wilson, Victor Corbett David, located at Royal Heights, Auckland (an individual). The Businesscheck database was last updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 205 Wairau Road, Wairau Valley, Auckland, 0627 | Physical & registered & service | 25 Jun 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Victor Corbett David Wilson
Royal Heights, Auckland, 0614
Address used since 24 May 2023
Massey, Waitakere, 0614
Address used since 16 Jun 2010 |
Director | 12 Dec 1995 - current |
Christine Ruth Wilson
Royal Heights, Auckland, 0614
Address used since 24 May 2023
Royal Heights, Auckland, 0614
Address used since 28 Apr 2023 |
Director | 28 Apr 2023 - current |
Christine Ruth Wilson
Massey East, Auckland 8, 0751
Address used since 03 Feb 2016 |
Director | 12 Dec 1995 - 01 Aug 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
19 Tatyana Place, Massey, Auckland, 0614 | Registered | 28 Jul 2008 - 25 Jun 2018 |
123b Dominion Road, Mt Eden, Auckland | Registered | 30 Mar 2005 - 28 Jul 2008 |
19 Tatyana Place, Massey East, Auckland 8 | Registered | 12 Dec 1995 - 30 Mar 2005 |
19 Tatyana Place, Massey East, Auckland 8 | Physical | 12 Dec 1995 - 25 Jun 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Christine Ruth Individual |
Royal Heights Auckland 0614 |
12 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Victor Corbett David Individual |
Royal Heights Auckland 0614 |
12 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Clifford Rex Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland |
12 Dec 1995 - current |
Wilson, Christine Ruth Individual |
Royal Heights Auckland 0614 |
12 Dec 1995 - current |
Wilson, Victor Corbett David Individual |
Royal Heights Auckland 0614 |
12 Dec 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Null - The Lester Corbett Family Trust Other |
12 Dec 1995 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
The Lester Corbett Family Trust Other |
12 Dec 1995 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Chipper Construction Limited 25 Tatyana Place |
|
Terrydel Electrical Contractors Limited 12 Tatyana Place |
|
Terrydel Electrical Limited 12 Tatyana Place |
|
Pump Solutions And Equipment Limited 27 Tatyana Place |
|
Sk Restaurant Limited 14 Tatyana Place |
|
National Ministries Of The Church Of God 14 Tatyana Place |