Vertical Horizonz Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037919962) was registered on 11 Feb 1998. 1 address is currently in use by the company: 64 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 (type: registered, physical). Candy Gillespie, Chartered Accountants, 20 Arawa Street, Matamata had been their registered address, up until 29 Nov 2004. 360 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 269 shares (74.72 per cent of shares), namely:
Bruce Mazengarb (an individual) located at Ohakune postcode 4691,
Thecla Mazengarb (an individual) located at Rd 2, Pukekohe postcode 2677. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 24.72 per cent of all shares (exactly 89 shares); it includes
Phillip Hokianga (an individual) - located at Grandview Heights, Hamilton. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.28%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Bruce Mazengarb, located at Ohakune (an individual). Businesscheck's information was updated on 29 Dec 2021.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
64 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 | Registered & physical | 29 Nov 2004 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce Arthur Mazengarb
Ohakune, 4691
Address used since 17 Mar 2011 |
Director | 11 Feb 1998 - current |
Alistair Peart
Ngaio, Wellington,
Address used since 15 Jul 1998 |
Director | 15 Jul 1998 - 30 Apr 2002 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Candy Gillespie, Chartered Accountants, 20 Arawa Street, Matamata | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 29 Nov 2004 |
C/- Peach Cornwall Limited, 22 Ayr Street, Ohakune | Physical | 15 Dec 1999 - 29 Nov 2004 |
C/- Kensington Swan, Third Floor, 89 The Terrace, Wellington | Physical | 15 Dec 1999 - 15 Dec 1999 |
C/- Kensington Swan, Third Floor, 89 The Terrace, Wellington | Registered | 15 Dec 1999 - 12 Apr 2000 |
Candy Gillespie, Chartered Accountants, 20 Arawa Street, Matamata | Registered & physical | 14 Sep 1998 - 15 Dec 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce Arthur Mazengarb Individual |
Ohakune 4691 |
11 Feb 1998 - current |
Thecla Mazengarb Individual |
Rd 2 Pukekohe 2677 |
17 Oct 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Phillip Warren Hokianga Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
24 Nov 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce Arthur Mazengarb Individual |
Ohakune 4691 |
11 Feb 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lisa Moana Tarry Individual |
Grandview Heights Hamilton 3200 |
27 Sep 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peach Cornwall Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037696351 Company Number: 939027 Entity |
11 Feb 1998 - 22 Nov 2004 | |
Cyril Owen Wise Individual |
R D 1 Ohakune |
22 Nov 2004 - 17 Oct 2013 |
Peach Cornwall Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037696351 Company Number: 939027 Entity |
11 Feb 1998 - 22 Nov 2004 |
Alto Capital Investments 3 Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
Franklin Party Hire 2013 Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
D M Roose Investments Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
D M Roose Corporate Trustee Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
Changing Jobs Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
Sema Limited 64 Beaver Road |