Ayy Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429036969029) was registered on 21 Mar 2001. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 23 Idris Road, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052 (type: registered, physical). Unit 4, 103 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 21 May 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 10 shares (10% of shares), namely:
Yoshikane, Yoko (an individual) located at Fendalton, Christchurch postcode 8052. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 90% of all shares (exactly 90 shares); it includes
Yoshikane, Akira (an individual) - located at Fendalton, Christchurch. "Wholesaling, all products (excluding storage and handling of goods)" (business classification F373980) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Ayy Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
23 Idris Road, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052 | Office & delivery | 13 May 2020 |
23 Idris Road, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052 | Registered & physical & service | 21 May 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Yoko Yoshikane
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 15 May 2020
Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011
Address used since 09 Jan 2019
Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304
Address used since 18 Nov 2013 |
Director | 21 Mar 2001 - current |
Akira Yoshikane
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 15 May 2020
Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011
Address used since 09 Jan 2019
Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304
Address used since 18 Nov 2013 |
Director | 21 Mar 2001 - current |
23 Idris Road , Fendalton , Christchurch , 8052 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 4, 103 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 24 May 2019 - 21 May 2020 |
15 Castalia Drive, Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304 | Registered & physical | 21 May 2014 - 24 May 2019 |
18a Haddow's Place, Lake Hayes Estate, Queenstown, 9304 | Registered & physical | 23 Sep 2011 - 21 May 2014 |
16 St Winifreds Place, Bryndwr, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 06 Mar 2008 - 23 Sep 2011 |
33/400 Durham Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 13 Dec 2004 - 06 Mar 2008 |
1/42 Chester Street West, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 21 Mar 2001 - 13 Dec 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yoshikane, Yoko Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8052 |
21 Mar 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yoshikane, Akira Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8052 |
21 Mar 2001 - current |
Plumb Source Limited 9 Castalia Drive |
|
Zara Wallace Limited 9 Castalia Drive |
|
New Zealand-experience.com Limited 41 Hope Avenue |
|
Remarkable New Zealand Limited 41 Hope Avenue |
|
Abs Plumbing Limited 36 Sylvan Street |
|
Rockababy Rentals Limited 36 Sylvan Street |
Global Connector Limited 79 Peninsula Rd, Kawarau Village |
Silver Star Enterprises Limited 4 High Street |
Clean-biz Limited Level 1, 20 Don Street |
Its A Small World Trading Company Limited Level 1, 243 Princes Street |
Huritini Limited 579 Old Tai Tapu Road |
Tip2toe Global Brands Limited 579 Old Tai Tapu Road |