A4 Somerset Development Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429036564729) was incorporated on 24 Apr 2002. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 120 Leet Street, Invercargill, 9810 (type: physical, registered). 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Cp Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Invercargill, Invercargill postcode 9810,
Flintoff, Brett Harry (an individual) located at Windsor, Invercargill postcode 9810. Our database was last updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
120 Leet Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Physical & registered & service | 24 Apr 2002 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Robert John Simpson
Invercargill, Invercargill, 9810
Address used since 29 Oct 2015 |
Director | 24 Apr 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cp Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036827589 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Invercargill Invercargill 9810 |
20 Jul 2010 - current |
Flintoff, Brett Harry Individual |
Windsor Invercargill 9810 |
20 Jul 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pryde, Thomas Mcneil Individual |
Kelvin Heights Queenstown |
24 Apr 2002 - 20 Jul 2010 |
Heenan, Peter James Individual |
Invercargill |
24 Apr 2002 - 20 Jul 2010 |
Heenan, Peter James Individual |
Invercargill |
24 Apr 2002 - 20 Jul 2010 |
Pryde, Thomas Mcneil Individual |
Kelvin Heights Queenstown |
24 Apr 2002 - 20 Jul 2010 |
Lucknow Limited 120 Leet Street |
|
Club Southland Enterprises Limited 115 Leet Street |
|
The Hearing Association Southland Branch Incorporated 126-128 Leet Street |
|
Eye Surgery Southland Limited Eye Surgery Southland |
|
Clive Wilson Switchboards Limited Gala Street |
|
The Genesis Group Limited 98 Yarrow Street |