60 South Investments Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429035931928) was registered on 11 Jun 2003. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 24 Shandon Road, Vauxhall, Dunedin, 9013 (type: office, registered). 965 Harington Point Road, Rd 2, Dunedin had been their physical address, up until 16 Feb 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Hunter, David Leister (an individual) located at Vauxhall, Dunedin postcode 9013. "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (ANZSIC K624030) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to 60 South Investments Limited. Our database was updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
24 Shandon Road, Vauxhall, Dunedin, 9013 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 05 Feb 2016 |
24 Shandon Road, Vauxhall, Dunedin, 9013 | Registered & physical & service | 16 Feb 2016 |
24 Shandon Road, Vauxhall, Dunedin, 9013 | Office | 04 Feb 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Leister Hunter
Vauxhall, Dunedin, 9013
Address used since 05 Feb 2016 |
Director | 11 Jun 2003 - current |
24 Shandon Road , Vauxhall , Dunedin , 9013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
965 Harington Point Road, Rd 2, Dunedin, 9077 | Physical & registered | 22 Feb 2011 - 16 Feb 2016 |
15 Bright Street, Dunedin | Registered & physical | 31 Jan 2006 - 22 Feb 2011 |
25 Wilson Avenue, Dunedin | Registered & physical | 11 Jun 2003 - 31 Jan 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hunter, David Leister Individual |
Vauxhall Dunedin 9013 |
11 Jun 2003 - current |
H & J Fraser Trustee Company Limited 59 Doon Street |
|
Nest Realty Limited 44 Shandon Road |
|
Cavendish Chambers Limited 44 Shandon Road |
|
Fitzgibbon Dairy Farms Limited 45 Doon Street |
|
P M Fitzgibbon & Co. Limited 45 Doon Street |
|
Subbarao Consulting Services Limited 46 Shandon Road |
Cegil Investments Limited 162 Doon Street |
F T Gray Trustee Limited 35 Moodie Street |
C E Gray Trustee Limited 35 Moodie Street |
Tinware Limited 1 Thomas Burns Street |
Allan's Scaffolding & Roofing Contracting Limited 1 Thomas Burns Street |
Mathew Barr Holdings Limited 248 Cumberland Street |