Nz Waldorf Apartments Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429034973363) was started on 04 Feb 2005. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 (type: registered, physical). 40 Beach Road, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 01 May 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 38 shares (38% of shares), namely:
Rubinstein, Avi (a director) located at St Ives, Nsw postcode 2075. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 24% of all shares (24 shares); it includes
Rinbac Pty Limited (an other) - located at Sydney Nsw 2000, Australia. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (38 shares, 38%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Wolf, Karen Ann, located at Darling Point, Nsw (an individual). The Businesscheck data was last updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 | Registered & physical & service | 01 May 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Avi Rubinstein
1 York Street, Sydney Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
St Ives, Nsw, 2075
Address used since 25 Sep 2015
1 York Street, Sydney Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 04 Feb 2005 - current |
Jonathan Robin Meyer Wolf
Sydney, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Double Bay, Nsw, 2028
Address used since 18 Apr 2018 |
Director | 18 Apr 2018 - current |
Sabine Massberg
40 Beach Road, Auckland, 1001
Address used since 08 Sep 2011 |
Director | 08 Sep 2011 - 11 Sep 2018 |
Frank Michael Wolf
1 York Street, Sydney Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Darling Point, Nsw, 2027
Address used since 10 Feb 2016
1 York Street, Sydney Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 04 Feb 2005 - 18 Apr 2018 |
Mark Stephen Higgins
Pearce 2607, Act, Australia,
Address used since 05 Mar 2010 |
Director | 05 Mar 2010 - 08 Apr 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
40 Beach Road, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 10 Sep 2010 - 01 May 2018 |
C/-morgan Coakle, 12th Floor, Tower 1, Shortland Centre, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 04 Feb 2005 - 10 Sep 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rubinstein, Avi Director |
St Ives Nsw 2075 |
24 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rinbac Pty Limited Other (Other) |
Sydney Nsw 2000 Australia |
04 Feb 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wolf, Karen Ann Individual |
Darling Point Nsw 2027 |
20 May 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nesuto Hotels Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042176909 Company Number: 5885227 Entity |
08 Mar 2016 - 24 Feb 2017 | |
Wolf, Frank Michael Individual |
Darling Point Nsw 2027 |
24 Feb 2017 - 20 May 2019 |
Nesuto Hotels Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042176909 Company Number: 5885227 Entity |
08 Mar 2016 - 24 Feb 2017 | |
Botany Downs Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035099468 Company Number: 1572939 Entity |
04 Feb 2005 - 08 Mar 2016 | |
NZ Waldorf Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042176909 Company Number: 5885227 Entity |
08 Mar 2016 - 24 Feb 2017 | |
NZ Waldorf Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042176909 Company Number: 5885227 Entity |
08 Mar 2016 - 24 Feb 2017 | |
Botany Downs Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035099468 Company Number: 1572939 Entity |
04 Feb 2005 - 08 Mar 2016 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Nesuto Hotels Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 5885227 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
40 Beach Road Auckland 1140 |
Norwest Wholesale Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
West City Motor Sport Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Riddell Developments Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Railedge Developments Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Howe Singh Investments Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
On2it Builders Limited 22 Catherine Street |