G90 Engineering Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429034693162) was registered on 24 Jun 2005. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 14 Tui Street, Matamata, 3400 (type: physical, service). Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 22 Nov 2016. G90 Engineering Limited used other aliases, namely: Reid & Harrison Engineering Limited from 24 Jun 2005 to 04 Feb 2019. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Semmens, Alan Gordon (an individual) located at Matamata, Matamata postcode 3400. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 99 per cent of all shares (exactly 99 shares); it includes
Semmens, Toni Maree (an individual) - located at Matamata, Matamata,
Semmens, Alan Gordon (an individual) - located at Matamata, Matamata. The Businesscheck information was updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
14 Tui Street, Matamata, 3400 | Physical & service & registered | 22 Nov 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alan Gordon Semmens
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 07 Nov 2022
Rd 1, Matamata, 3471
Address used since 03 Nov 2020
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 11 Feb 2013 |
Director | 14 Nov 2005 - current |
Toni Maree Semmens
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 07 Nov 2022
Rd 1, Matamata, 3471
Address used since 03 Nov 2020
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 01 Aug 2016 |
Director | 01 Aug 2016 - current |
Seaton Robert Dalley
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 23 Jul 2012 |
Director | 24 Jun 2005 - 01 Aug 2016 |
Craig Young
Penrose, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 2008 |
Director | 01 Apr 2008 - 31 Mar 2011 |
Andrew Craig Leadbeater
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 08 Feb 2010 |
Director | 01 Sep 2007 - 23 Mar 2010 |
Patrick Joseph Mccormick
Penrose, Auckland,
Address used since 24 Jun 2005 |
Director | 24 Jun 2005 - 01 Apr 2008 |
Ian Joseph Crispe
Matamata,
Address used since 17 Dec 2005 |
Director | 14 Nov 2005 - 03 Aug 2007 |
John Frederick Day
R D 2, Matamata,
Address used since 14 Nov 2005 |
Director | 14 Nov 2005 - 21 Dec 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical | 11 Mar 2015 - 22 Nov 2016 |
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Physical & registered | 21 Feb 2012 - 11 Mar 2015 |
Level 1, 101 Station Road, Penrose, Auckland | Registered & physical | 24 Jun 2005 - 21 Feb 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Semmens, Alan Gordon Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
08 Sep 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Semmens, Toni Maree Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
10 Aug 2016 - current |
Semmens, Alan Gordon Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
08 Sep 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dalley, Seaton Robert Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
18 Nov 2005 - 01 Apr 2016 |
Young, Craig Individual |
Penrose Auckland |
14 Jan 2009 - 09 Jul 2012 |
Day, John Frederick Individual |
R D 2 Matamata |
18 Nov 2005 - 23 Nov 2005 |
Leadbeater, Andrew Craig Individual |
Matamata |
25 Oct 2007 - 31 Aug 2009 |
Crispe Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034479162 Company Number: 1713792 Entity |
18 Nov 2005 - 03 Jan 2007 | |
Dalley Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032565317 Company Number: 2171981 Entity |
14 Jan 2009 - 10 Aug 2016 | |
Crispe, Ian Joseph Individual |
Matamata |
18 Nov 2005 - 03 Jan 2007 |
Crispe Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034479162 Company Number: 1713792 Entity |
18 Nov 2005 - 03 Jan 2007 | |
Dalley Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032565317 Company Number: 2171981 Entity |
14 Jan 2009 - 10 Aug 2016 | |
Semmens, Allan Gordon Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
18 Nov 2005 - 08 Sep 2017 |
Mccormick, Patrick Joseph Individual |
Penrose Auckland |
24 Jun 2005 - 22 Feb 2008 |
Reid & Harrison (1980) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040040158 Company Number: 198995 Entity |
01 Apr 2016 - 10 Aug 2016 | |
Dalley, Robert Individual |
Matamata |
24 Jun 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Dalley, Seaton Robert Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
18 Nov 2005 - 01 Apr 2016 |
Reid & Harrison (1980) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040040158 Company Number: 198995 Entity |
01 Apr 2016 - 10 Aug 2016 |
Mcfarlane Innovations Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
Oxford Thoroughbreds Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
Willow-glen Goats Ii Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
B & C Anderton Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
Chittick Investments Limited 14 Tui Street |
|
Harris Begovich Livestock Limited 14 Tui Street |