Chong's Enterprise Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034655627) was launched on 12 Jul 2005. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 25 Arney Crescent, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 (type: registered, physical). 109 Sylvan Avenue, Northcote, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 19 Aug 2008. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Chong, Lin Chun (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
25 Arney Crescent, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Aug 2008 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lin Chun Chong
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 01 Jun 2008 |
Director | 12 Jul 2005 - current |
Suk Yin Chong
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 01 Jun 2008 |
Director | 12 Jul 2005 - 28 Feb 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
109 Sylvan Avenue, Northcote, Auckland | Physical & registered | 12 Jul 2005 - 19 Aug 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chong, Lin Chun Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
12 Jul 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chong, Suk Yin Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
12 Jul 2005 - 22 Jul 2019 |
Marisco Vineyards Limited 26 Arney Crescent |
|
Leefield Station Limited 26 Arney Crescent |
|
Waihopai River Vineyard Limited 26 Arney Crescent |
|
Fairhall Cliffs Limited 26 Arney Crescent |
|
Marisco Properties Limited 26 Arney Crescent |
|
Marisco Trustee Limited 26 Arney Crescent |