Gl 2006 Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429034218464) was launched on 04 Apr 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, Westgate Chambers, 3A/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre, Auckland, 0814 (type: physical, registered). Level 1, Westgate Chambers, 3A/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 27 Sep 2017. 100 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 49 shares (49 per cent of shares), namely:
Chapmans Trustees Limited (an entity) located at 3A/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre, Auckland postcode 0814,
Rugg, Gavin Andrew (an individual) located at Avondale, Auckland 1007. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 49 per cent of all shares (49 shares); it includes
Chapmans Trustees Limited (an entity) - located at 3A/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre, Auckland,
Rugg, Linda Beryl (an individual) - located at Avondale, Auckland 1007. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Rugg, Gavin Andrew, located at Avondale, Auckland 1007 (an individual). Businesscheck's database was last updated on 20 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Westgate Chambers, 3a/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre, Auckland, 0814 | Physical & registered & service | 27 Sep 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Linda Beryl Rugg
Avondale, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 03 Sep 2009 |
Director | 04 Apr 2006 - current |
Gavin Andrew Rugg
Avondale, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 03 Sep 2009 |
Director | 04 Apr 2006 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Westgate Chambers, 3a/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre, Auckland, 0614 | Registered & physical | 03 Nov 2016 - 27 Sep 2017 |
Level 1, Westgate Chambers, Main Street, Westgate Centre, Waitakere City, 0614 | Registered & physical | 22 Aug 2007 - 03 Nov 2016 |
C/o Gilligan Rowe & Associates Ltd, Chartered Accountants & Asset Planners, Level 6/135 Broadway, Newmarket, Aucklan | Registered & physical | 04 Apr 2006 - 22 Aug 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapmans Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035810544 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
3a/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre Auckland 0814 |
04 Apr 2006 - current |
Rugg, Gavin Andrew Individual |
Avondale Auckland 1007 |
04 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapmans Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035810544 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
3a/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre Auckland 0814 |
04 Apr 2006 - current |
Rugg, Linda Beryl Individual |
Avondale Auckland 1007 |
04 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rugg, Gavin Andrew Individual |
Avondale Auckland 1007 |
04 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rugg, Linda Beryl Individual |
Avondale Auckland 1007 |
04 Apr 2006 - current |
West Couriers Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Nationwide Touring Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Zoro Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Gubb Design Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Utopia Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Westgate No.2 Limited Level 1, 1a / 7 Maki Street |