M Factor Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429033825489) was incorporated on 10 Oct 2006. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 1949 Omihi Road, Greta Valley, Rd3 Amberley, 7483 (type: office, delivery). 6 Kensington Ave, Rangiora had been their physical address, up to 12 Oct 2016. 1000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Lucas, Maree Patricia (a director) located at Greta Valley, Rd3 Amberley postcode 7483. "Event, recreational or promotional, management" (ANZSIC N729930) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to M Factor Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 11 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1949 Omihi Road, Greta Valley, Rd3 Amberley, 7483 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Oct 2016 |
1949 Omihi Road, Greta Valley, Rd3 Amberley, 7483 | Office & delivery & postal | 07 Oct 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Maree Patricia Lucas
Greta Valley, Rd3 Amberley, 7483
Address used since 04 Oct 2016 |
Director | 10 Oct 2006 - current |
Maree Patricia Harris
Greta Valley, Rd3 Amberley, 7483
Address used since 04 Oct 2016 |
Director | 10 Oct 2006 - current |
Richenda Christy Kennett
Bryndwr, Christchurch,
Address used since 10 Oct 2006 |
Director | 10 Oct 2006 - 02 Feb 2007 |
1949 Omihi Road , Greta Valley , Rd3 Amberley , 7483 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
6 Kensington Ave, Rangiora, 7400 | Physical & registered | 19 Oct 2015 - 12 Oct 2016 |
3d/39 Mackelvie St, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered | 21 Oct 2013 - 19 Oct 2015 |
16 Altham Avenue, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Physical | 09 Oct 2012 - 19 Oct 2015 |
16 Altham Avenue, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Registered | 09 Oct 2012 - 21 Oct 2013 |
6 Kensington Avenue, Rangiora, 7400 | Physical & registered | 09 Jan 2012 - 09 Oct 2012 |
6 Kensington Avenue, Rangiora | Registered | 20 Dec 2006 - 09 Jan 2012 |
225b Travis Road, North New Brighton, Christchurch | Registered | 10 Oct 2006 - 20 Dec 2006 |
225b Travis Road, North New Brighton, Christchurch | Physical | 10 Oct 2006 - 09 Jan 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lucas, Maree Patricia Director |
Greta Valley Rd3 Amberley 7483 |
26 Oct 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kennett, Richenda Christy Individual |
Bryndwr Christchurch |
10 Oct 2006 - 10 Oct 2006 |
Harris, Maree Patricia Individual |
Greta Valley Rd3 Amberley 7483 |
10 Oct 2006 - 26 Oct 2018 |
2 Fit Limited 20 Altham Avenue |
|
The Workroom NZ Limited 9 Altham Avenue |
|
G Triple M Limited 7 Shaw Street |
|
Gmm Consulting Limited 7 Shaw Street |
|
World Wide Open Limited 15 Shaw Street |
|
Power Stanfield Consulting Limited 7 Altham Avenue |
Handle The Jandal Limited Flat 1, 31 Reimers Avenue |
Rvfl Holdings Limited 519 New North Road |
Jj Mgmt Limited L1, 61-63 St Lukes Road |
Action Indoor Sports Stadiums Auckland Limited 389 Dominion Road |
Millennium Sports Limited 389 Dominion Road |
E In E Limited 82 View Road |