65 Wiggins Street Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033671161) was started on 15 Jan 2007. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Level 1, 151 High Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (type: postal, office). Level 3, 50 Victoria Street, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 18 Mar 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Evatt, Thomas William (an individual) located at Christchurch postcode 8081. "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to 65 Wiggins Street Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 151 High Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Mar 2020 |
Level 1, 151 High Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Postal & office & delivery | 26 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas William Evatt
Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 02 Jun 2016 |
Director | 15 Jan 2007 - current |
Sally Anne Kemp
Brooklyn, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 01 Jan 2009 |
Director | 15 Jan 2007 - 29 May 2012 |
Level 1, 151 High Street , Christchurch Central , Christchurch , 8011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 50 Victoria Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered | 15 Jun 2018 - 18 Mar 2020 |
243 Tancred Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Physical & registered | 17 Jun 2015 - 15 Jun 2018 |
Cooney Silva Evatt Limited, 243 Tancred Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & physical | 07 Jun 2012 - 17 Jun 2015 |
Nicoll Cooney Silva Limited, 243 Tancred Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & physical | 25 Nov 2011 - 07 Jun 2012 |
22 Moorhouse Ave, Christchurch 8140 | Registered & physical | 31 May 2010 - 25 Nov 2011 |
Level 3, 22 Moorhouse Avenue, Christchurch 8140 | Registered | 25 Jun 2009 - 31 May 2010 |
Level 3, 22 Moorhouse Avenue, Christchurch | Physical | 25 Jun 2009 - 31 May 2010 |
Level 7, Abm Ambro Craigs House, 90 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Physical | 15 Jan 2007 - 25 Jun 2009 |
Level 7, Abm Amro Craigs House, 90 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Registered | 15 Jan 2007 - 25 Jun 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Evatt, Thomas William Individual |
Christchurch 8081 |
15 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kemp, Sally Anne Individual |
Brooklyn Wellington |
15 Jan 2007 - 29 May 2012 |
Tp Trustees 2015 Limited 243 Tancred Street |
|
Dorie Charitable Trust Board 243 Tancred Street |
|
Methven Rodeo Club Incorporated C/o Nicoll Cooney Silva Ltd |
|
Ashburton Centennial Sports Hall Society Incorporated Tancred Street |
|
Kiwizimba Limited 247 Tancred Street |
|
The Ashburton College Charitable Foundation Gabites Sinclair & Partners Limited |
Kjg Holdings Limited 54 Cass Street |
Haley Bain Investments Limited 144 Tancred Street |
Park View Investments Limited 144 Tancred Street |
Sowman Investments Limited 144 Tancred Street |
Sunnyday Properties Investment Limited 144 Tancred Street |
Komborero Limited 144 Tancred Street |