84M Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033546285) was registered on 21 Mar 2007. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 15D Minden Road, Rd 6, Tauranga, 3176 (type: physical, registered). 6 Cherry Way, Bethlehem, Tauranga had been their physical address, up until 09 Apr 2019. 84M Limited used other aliases, namely: Shaw Property Holdings Limited from 21 Mar 2007 to 17 Mar 2011. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Smyth, Stephen Frederick (a director) located at Rd 3, Te Puke postcode 3183. Businesscheck's information was updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6 Cherry Way, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 | Other (Address for Records) | 29 Sep 2014 |
15d Minden Road, Rd 6, Tauranga, 3176 | Physical & registered & service | 09 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stephen Frederick Smyth
Rd 3, Te Puke, 3183
Address used since 18 Jun 2012 |
Director | 18 Jun 2012 - current |
Robert James Neilson
Apartment 201, 424 Maunganui Road, Mount Maunganui,
Address used since 01 Feb 2009 |
Director | 01 Apr 2008 - 18 Jun 2012 |
Kirsty Michelle Shaw
Mount Maunganui,
Address used since 18 Jun 2007 |
Director | 21 Mar 2007 - 01 Apr 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
6 Cherry Way, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 07 Oct 2014 - 09 Apr 2019 |
Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 10 Mar 2014 - 07 Oct 2014 |
Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga 3110 | Physical & registered | 25 Sep 2008 - 10 Mar 2014 |
C/-rodewald Hart Brown Limited, Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga 3110 | Registered & physical | 11 Aug 2008 - 25 Sep 2008 |
C/-rodewald Hart Brown Ltd, Cnr Jocelyn & Queen Streets, Te Puke | Registered & physical | 21 Mar 2007 - 11 Aug 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smyth, Stephen Frederick Director |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
20 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Shaw, Kirsty Michelle Individual |
Mount Maunganui |
21 Mar 2007 - 18 Jun 2007 |
Robert James Neilson Director |
The Quest Apartment 201 424 Maunganui Road, Mount Maunganui 3144 |
17 Mar 2011 - 20 Jun 2012 |
Moore, Lynne Marie Individual |
C/o Level 1, The Hub, 525 Cameron Road Tauranga 3144 |
17 Mar 2011 - 20 Jun 2012 |
Neilson, Robert James Individual |
424 Maunganui Road Mount Maunganui |
26 May 2008 - 17 Mar 2011 |
Neilson, Robert James Individual |
The Quest Apartment 201 424 Maunganui Road, Mount Maunganui 3144 |
17 Mar 2011 - 20 Jun 2012 |
Bexenterry Limited 6 Cherry Way |
|
Bethlehem Pottery Club Incorporated 13 Bethlehem Road |
|
Tony Han Optometrists Limited 7 Bethlehem Rd |
|
Albert St Property Limited Bethlehem Shopping Centre |
|
Guang Zhou Bai Yun Limited J10a Bethlethem Town Center |
|
Immerse Limited Shop A1 |