62 Ghuznee Street Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032857757) was incorporated on 19 Mar 2008. 9 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 8, 22 Hawkestone Street, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, service). Level 14, 13-27 Manners Street, Wellington had been their physical address, up to 26 Aug 2022. 62 Ghuznee Street Limited used other names, namely: Ghuznee Cuba Developments Limited from 19 Mar 2008 to 14 Aug 2017. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Eyal Corporate Trustees Limited (an entity) located at 22 Hawkestone Street, Wellington postcode 6011. Businesscheck's information was updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 11785, Manners Street, Wellington, 6142 | Postal | 02 Apr 2019 |
Level 14, 13-27 Manners Street, Wellington, 6011 | Delivery & office | 21 Apr 2020 |
Level 8, 138 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & service & registered | 26 Aug 2022 |
Level 8, 138 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Office & delivery | 13 Apr 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Eyal Aharoni
Hataitai, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 17 Jul 2024
Roseneath, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 01 Oct 2023
Hataitai, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 21 Apr 2020
305 Evans Bay Parade, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 29 Apr 2015 |
Director | 19 Mar 2008 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 8, 138 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Office & delivery | 13 Apr 2023 |
Level 8, 22 Hawkestone Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & service | 06 May 2024 |
Level 14 , 13-27 Manners Street , Wellington , 6011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 14, 13-27 Manners Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 10 Dec 2019 - 26 Aug 2022 |
Level 7, Munro Benge House, 104 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 10 Apr 2019 - 10 Dec 2019 |
Level 7, 104 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 12 Apr 2017 - 10 Apr 2019 |
Level 6, 17-21 Whitmore Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 05 May 2014 - 12 Apr 2017 |
Level 3, 86-90 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 08 May 2013 - 05 May 2014 |
Level 4, 102-122 Lambton Quay, Wellington 6011 | Registered & physical | 13 Mar 2009 - 08 May 2013 |
Level 11, 86-96 Victoria Street, Wellington | Physical & registered | 19 Mar 2008 - 13 Mar 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eyal Corporate Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035758983 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
22 Hawkestone Street Wellington 6011 |
19 Mar 2008 - current |
Pooja Foods Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Customs Agents Wellington Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
Ppem Nominees Limited Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street |
|
Glading Family Trustees Limited Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace |