Nz Fashion Festival Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429031769563) was registered on 02 Dec 2009. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Findex, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, 7020 (type: physical, registered). Crowe Horwath Richmond, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond had been their registered address, until 14 Oct 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Forca Event Management Limited (an entity) located at Richmond, Nelson, Null postcode 7430. "Event, recreational or promotional, management" (ANZSIC N729930) is the category the ABS issued Nz Fashion Festival Limited. Our database was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
83 Sanctuary Drive, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Postal & office & delivery | 04 Oct 2019 |
Findex, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, 7020 | Physical & registered & service | 14 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Pieter Ane Stewart
Horoata, No 2 R D, Darfield, 7572
Address used since 16 Jan 2017
Leaches Road, No 2 R D, Darfield, 7572
Address used since 17 Oct 2017 |
Director | 02 Dec 2009 - current |
Myken Ane Stewart
Palm Beach, Waiheke Island, Auckland, 1081
Address used since 10 Nov 2010 |
Director | 02 Dec 2009 - 31 Mar 2012 |
83 Sanctuary Drive , Stoke , Nelson , 7011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Crowe Horwath Richmond, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, 7020 | Registered & physical | 04 Nov 2013 - 14 Oct 2020 |
Whk, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, 7050 | Physical & registered | 18 Apr 2012 - 04 Nov 2013 |
Gulf Accountants Limited, 4 Blake Street, Surfdale, Waiheke Island, 1081 | Physical & registered | 18 Nov 2010 - 18 Apr 2012 |
Hintons Limited, Chartered Accountants, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson | Registered & physical | 02 Dec 2009 - 18 Nov 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Forca Event Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030878150 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Richmond Nelson Null 7430 |
15 May 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stewart, Pieter Ane Individual |
Horoata No 2 R D, Darfield |
02 Dec 2009 - 15 May 2012 |
Stewart, Myken Ane Individual |
Onetangi Waiheke Island, Auckland 1081 |
02 Dec 2009 - 15 May 2012 |
Ground Anchor Systems Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Adcock Properties Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Orauea Farm Management Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Selbourne Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Fried Eggs On Toast Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Clements Windows And Doors Limited 20 Oxford Street |
Fw Holdings Limited 20 Oxford Street |
Online Brand Management Limited 16 Tyree Drive |
The Cycling Company Limited 47 Arrow Street |
Mega Slide Nelson Limited 714 Atawhai Crescent |
Social Bubs Limited 29 Marybank Road |
Help 4 U Group Limited 77 Weld Street |