Gbcd Property Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030550964) was launched on 16 Aug 2012. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 3 Alba Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, service). 75 Titirangi Rd, New Lynn, Auckland had been their physical address, until 15 Aug 2017. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 67 shares (67 per cent of shares), namely:
Krishnamurthi, Sivamani (an individual) located at Epsom, Auckland postcode 1023. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33 per cent of all shares (33 shares); it includes
Krishnamurthi, Sivamani (an individual) - located at Epsom, Auckland. "Investment - commercial property" (business classification L671230) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Gbcd Property Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 23 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
75 Titirangi Rd, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Aug 2017 |
75 Titirangi Rd, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 | Delivery | 10 Aug 2021 |
3 Alba Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & service | 09 Apr 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sivamani Krishnamurthi
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 11 Jun 2019
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 02 Aug 2016 |
Director | 17 May 2014 - current |
Aaron Mark Colthurst
Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 11 Sep 2013 |
Director | 11 Sep 2013 - 19 May 2014 |
Siva Krishamurthi
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 16 Aug 2012 |
Director | 16 Aug 2012 - 11 Sep 2013 |
Aaron Mark Colthurst
Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 23 Jul 2013 |
Director | 23 Jul 2013 - 23 Jul 2013 |
75 Titirangi Rd , New Lynn , Auckland , 0600 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
75 Titirangi Rd, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 | Physical & registered | 22 Dec 2016 - 15 Aug 2017 |
11 Nixon Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Physical & registered | 26 May 2014 - 22 Dec 2016 |
300 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Physical | 18 Sep 2013 - 26 May 2014 |
64a Wainui Avenue, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 | Registered | 21 Jun 2013 - 26 May 2014 |
3 Alba Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered | 16 Aug 2012 - 21 Jun 2013 |
3 Alba Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical | 16 Aug 2012 - 18 Sep 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Krishnamurthi, Sivamani Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
17 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Krishnamurthi, Sivamani Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
17 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Krishamurthi, Siva Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
16 Aug 2012 - 21 Sep 2013 |
Colthurst, Aaron Individual |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 |
16 Aug 2012 - 11 Jun 2019 |
Krishnamurthi, Sivamani Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
04 May 2014 - 12 May 2014 |
Siva Krishamurthi Director |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
16 Aug 2012 - 21 Sep 2013 |
Patel, Davesh Individual |
Mangawhai Mangawhai 0505 |
16 Aug 2012 - 21 Sep 2013 |
Bc394537 Limited 75 Titirangi Rd |
|
Merahan Rs Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
|
Jec Trading Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
|
Independent Professionals Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
|
Texan Trustees Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
|
Dobson Scott Limited 75 Titirangi Road |
Amanda Investment Limited 58 Titirangi Road |
Khans Developments And Investments Limited 32a Tomo Street |
Uma Investments Limited 5 Rata Street |
An Everything Co. Limited 32b Wattle Street |
Hutchinson Investment Limited Flat 2, 10 Miro Street |
Bell Investments (2005) Limited 6 D Westech Pl |