88 Challenge Limited (issued a business number of 9429030427655) was started on 27 Nov 2012. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 10 Steamer Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 (type: registered, physical). 7 Valley Rd., Browns Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 24 Aug 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 40 shares (40 per cent of shares), namely:
Delich, Peter James (an individual) located at Silverdale, Silverdale postcode 0932. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 40 per cent of all shares (40 shares); it includes
Pizarro Delich, Rose Marie (an individual) - located at Silverdale, Silverdale. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (20 shares, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Delich, Royce Norman, located at Silverdale, Silverdale (an individual). "Petroleum and natural gas drilling services" (business classification B109030) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued 88 Challenge Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 28 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
10 Steamer Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Office | 14 Aug 2020 |
10 Steamer Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter James Delich
Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932
Address used since 14 Aug 2020
Binictican, Subic Bay Free Port Zone, 2222
Address used since 25 Jun 2015 |
Director | 27 Nov 2012 - current |
Royce Norman Delich
Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932
Address used since 05 Aug 2021
Windsor Park, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 14 Aug 2020
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 25 Aug 2015 |
Director | 27 Nov 2012 - current |
Rose Marie Pizarro Delich
Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932
Address used since 05 Aug 2021
Binictican, Subic Bay Free Port Zone, 2222
Address used since 25 Jun 2015 |
Director | 27 Nov 2012 - current |
10 Steamer Road , Silverdale , Silverdale , 0932 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7 Valley Rd., Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical | 25 Aug 2015 - 24 Aug 2020 |
10 Steamers Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Physical & registered | 19 Jul 2013 - 25 Aug 2015 |
16 Dan Tori Place, Orewa, Orewa, 0931 | Registered & physical | 27 Nov 2012 - 19 Jul 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Delich, Peter James Individual |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 |
27 Nov 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pizarro Delich, Rose Marie Individual |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 |
27 Nov 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Delich, Royce Norman Individual |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 |
27 Nov 2012 - current |
Syon Investments Limited 1a Valley Road |
|
Out Of Egypt Limited 10 Valley Road |
|
Marketing Decisions Support Limited 10 Valley Road |
|
Natzki Ryan Limited 8 Valley Road |
|
Send Money Home Limited 13 Oban Road |
|
The Sultan Limited 13 Oban Road |
Bonus Coil And Wireline Services Limited Level 9, 151 Queen Street |
Marokopa Drilling Limited The Todd Building |
Bonus Drilling (nz) Limited Level 9, 151 Queen Street |
Interdrill Limited 100a Swansea Road |
Woodside Energy (new Zealand) Limited 20 Gardner Road |
Woodside Energy Holdings (new Zealand) Limited 20 Gardner Road |