Northland Harvest Management Kerikeri Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030084681) was started on 27 Aug 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 108 Kerikeri Road, Kerikeri, 0230 (type: physical, registered). 25 Homestead Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri had been their registered address, up until 09 Feb 2016. 100 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 2 shares (2% of shares), namely:
Parrish, Carol (an individual) located at Rd 1, Kerikeri postcode 0294. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 96% of all shares (exactly 96 shares); it includes
Parrish, Carol (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Kerikeri,
Parrish, Peter Neville (a director) - located at Rd 1, Kerikeri. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (2 shares, 2%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Parrish, Peter Neville, located at Rd 1, Kerikeri (a director). "Tree cutting or felling - forest" (ANZSIC A030250) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Northland Harvest Management Kerikeri Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 07 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
108 Kerikeri Road, Kerikeri, 0230 | Physical & registered & service | 09 Feb 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Neville Parrish
Rd 1, Kerikeri, 0294
Address used since 03 Oct 2022
Rd 1, Kerikeri, 0294
Address used since 27 Aug 2013
Kerikeri, 0293
Address used since 11 Oct 2019 |
Director | 27 Aug 2013 - current |
David Reginald Warren
Rd 9, Whangarei, 0179
Address used since 27 Aug 2013 |
Director | 27 Aug 2013 - 28 Sep 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
25 Homestead Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 | Registered & physical | 25 Nov 2014 - 09 Feb 2016 |
25 Homestead Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 | Physical & registered | 27 Aug 2013 - 25 Nov 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Parrish, Carol Individual |
Rd 1 Kerikeri 0294 |
27 Aug 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Parrish, Carol Individual |
Rd 1 Kerikeri 0294 |
27 Aug 2013 - current |
Parrish, Peter Neville Director |
Rd 1 Kerikeri 0294 |
27 Aug 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Parrish, Peter Neville Director |
Rd 1 Kerikeri 0294 |
27 Aug 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hawkes Bay Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037387402 Company Number: 1011146 Entity |
27 Aug 2013 - 19 Oct 2015 | |
Warren, David Reginald Individual |
Rd 9 Whangarei 0179 |
27 Aug 2013 - 19 Oct 2015 |
David Reginald Warren Director |
Rd 9 Whangarei 0179 |
27 Aug 2013 - 19 Oct 2015 |
Warren, Teresa Carol Individual |
Rd 9 Whangarei 0179 |
27 Aug 2013 - 19 Oct 2015 |
Hawkes Bay Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037387402 Company Number: 1011146 Entity |
27 Aug 2013 - 19 Oct 2015 |
Cafe Malaahi Limited 108 Kerikeri Road |
|
Alberon Trust Limited 108 Kerikeri Road |
|
Oxley Construction Limited 108 Kerikeri Road |
|
Plm Enterprises Limited 108 Kerikeri Road |
|
Claire Frances Trustee Limited 108 Kerikeri Road |
|
Heron Hill Trustee Company Limited 108 Kerikeri Road |
Coyote Contracting Limited 124 Kerikeri Road |
Fountain Tree Felling Limited 2 Redan Road |
Hawkes Harvesting Limited 134 Bank Street |
Woodlot Contracting Limited 3193 Paparoa-oakleigh Road |
Lgt NZ Limited 125 Swanson Road |
Asian Natural Resources (no.1) Limited Level 4, Hamburg Sud House |